Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7251394 | Global Dossier | 31.07.2007 | B2 | US2007014516 | 18.01.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2004191744 | 29.06.2004 | JP2004344830 | 29.11.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2006047951 | Global Dossier | 16.02.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2004191744 | 29.06.2004 | JP2004344830 | 29.11.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1612588 | Global Dossier | 13.10.2010 | B1 | EP1612588 | 22.03.2006 | A3 | EP1612588 | 04.01.2006 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP2004191744 | 29.06.2004 | JP2004344830 | 29.11.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE602005024080D1 | 25.11.2010 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP2004191744 | 29.06.2004 | JP2004344830 | 29.11.2004 |