EP1594008 - Method and apparatus for submicron ic design using edge fragment tagging [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 22.08.2014 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 24.09.2014 [2014/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mentor Graphics Corporation 8005 S.W. Boeckman Road Wilsonville, OR 97070 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/45] | For all designated states Mentor Graphics Corporation 8005 S.W. Boeckman Road Wilsonville Oregon 97070 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cobb, Nicolas Bailey 1632 Willow Lake Lane San Jose CA 95131 / US | 02 /
Martinian, Emin 16 B Jerome Street Medford MA 02155 / US | [2005/45] | Representative(s) | Wilson, Timothy James, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2012/39] |
Former [2008/36] | Samuels, Adrian James Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2005/45] | Leinweber & Zimmermann Rosental 7, II Aufgang 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05014190.2 | 14.03.2000 | [2005/45] | Priority number, date | US19990302700 | 30.04.1999 Original published format: US 302700 | [2005/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1594008 | Date: | 09.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1594008 | Date: | 03.03.2010 | [2010/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.01.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/20 | [2005/45] | CPC: |
G03F7/70541 (EP,US);
G03F1/36 (EP,US);
G03F7/70441 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2005/45] | Title | German: | Methode und Gerät zum Erstellen eins sub-mikrometeric Designs mit Etikettierung von Kantenelementen | [2005/45] | English: | Method and apparatus for submicron ic design using edge fragment tagging | [2005/45] | French: | méthode et appareil pour l'établissement de plans de circuit intégré sub-micrométriques comportant le marquage d'éléments de coin | [2005/45] | Examination procedure | 30.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/45] | 29.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.07.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 16.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.04.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.08.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/39] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP00917913.6 / EP1175642 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20000917913) is 24.11.2008 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 16.09.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 16.09.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.10.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 06.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 08.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 10.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 07.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 07.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 10.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - DEPESA P ET AL, AUTOMATED CRITICAL DIMENSION AND REGISTRATION COMMUNICATION, PROCEEDINGS OF THE SPIE, (19910101), vol. 1604, pages 26 - 33, XP000905302 [X] 1,4-6,9,12-14,17 * the whole document * | [X] - OHNUMA H ET AL, Fast chip level OPC system on mask database, PROCEEDINGS OF THE SPIE - THE INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR OPTICAL ENGINEERING, 1997, SPIE-INT. SOC. OPT. ENG, USA, PAGE(S) 145 - 153, PHOTOMASK AND X-RAY MASK TECHNOLOGY IV, KAWASAKI, JAPAN, 17-18 APRIL 1997, (19970418), ISSN 0277-786X, XP000933786 [X] 1,3-9,11-17 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.277249 | [X] - OHNUMA H ET AL, "Lithography computer aided design technology for embedded memory in logic", MICROPROCESSES AND NANOTECHNOLOGY '98. 1998 INTERNATIONAL MICROPROCESSES AND NANOTECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE, KYOUNGJU, SOUTH KOREA, 13-16 JULY 1998, Japanese Journal of Applied Physics, Part 1 (Regular Papers, Short Notes & Review Papers), Dec. 1998, Publication Office, Japanese Journal Appl. Phys, Japan, (19980716), vol. 37, no. 12B, ISSN 0021-4922, pages 6686 - 6688, XP000880238 [X] 1,3-9,11-49 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1143/JJAP.37.6686 | [A] - COBB N ET AL, "MATHEMATICAL AND CAD FRAMEWORK FOR PROXIMITY CORRECTION", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SPIE - THE INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR OPTICAL ENGINEERING, SPIE, US, (19960313), vol. 2726, ISSN 0277-786X, pages 208 - 222, XP008022569 [A] 18-49 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.240907 | [A] - COBB N ET AL, "FAST, LOW-COMPLEXITY MASK DESIGN", OPTICAL / LASER MICROLITHOGRAPHY 8. SANTA CLARA, FEB. 22 - 24, 1995; [PROCEEDINGS OF SPIE. OPTICAL / LASER MICROLITHOGRAPHY], BELLINGHAM, SPIE, US, (19950222), VOL. 2440, ISBN 978-0-8194-1788-6, pages 313 - 327, XP000988740 [A] 18-49 * the whole document * | by applicant | - OHNUMA ET AL., "Lithography Computer Aided Design Technology for Embedded Memory in Logic", JPN. J. APPL. PHYS., (1998), vol. 37, doi:doi:10.1143/JJAP.37.6686, pages 6686 - 6688, XP000880238 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1143/JJAP.37.6686 |