EP1688336 - Brake device for pushcart [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.09.2011 Database last updated on 10.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wonderland Nurserygoods Co., Ltd. 10F, No. 433 Rui-Kwang Road Neihu Taipei / TW | [N/P] |
Former [2010/46] | For all designated states Wonderland Nurserygoods Co., Ltd. 10F, No. 433 Rui-Kwang Road Neihu Taipei / TW | ||
Former [2006/32] | For all designated states Wonderland Nurserygoods Co., Ltd. 10F, No. 433, Rui Kwang Road, Neihu Taipei / TW | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chen, Shun-Min 10F, No. 433, Rui-Kwang Road Neihu Taipei / TW | [2006/32] | Representative(s) | Rössler, Matthias KNH Patentanwälte Kahlhöfer Neumann Rößler Heine Postfach 10 33 63 40024 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/32] | Rössler, Matthias KNH Patentanwälte, Kahlhöfer Neumann Herzog Fiesser, Karlstrasse 76 40210 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 05014250.4 | 30.06.2005 | [2006/32] | Priority number, date | CN2005201555 | 28.01.2005 Original published format: CN200520001555 | [2006/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1688336 | Date: | 09.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1688336 | Date: | 15.08.2007 | [2007/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1688336 | Date: | 17.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B62B9/08 | [2007/33] | CPC: |
B62B7/08 (EP,US);
B62B9/082 (EP,US);
B62B9/087 (EP,US);
B62B2205/02 (EP,US);
B62B5/0433 (EP,US);
B62B5/0457 (EP,US);
B62B5/0461 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2006/32] | B62B5/04, B62B9/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/32] | Title | German: | Bremse für Transportwagen | [2006/32] | English: | Brake device for pushcart | [2006/32] | French: | Frein pour chariot de transport | [2006/32] | Examination procedure | 14.11.2007 | Examination requested [2007/52] | 04.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.10.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 07.10.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.08.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.11.2010 | BE | 17.11.2010 | CY | 17.11.2010 | CZ | 17.11.2010 | DK | 17.11.2010 | EE | 17.11.2010 | FI | 17.11.2010 | HU | 17.11.2010 | IT | 17.11.2010 | LT | 17.11.2010 | PL | 17.11.2010 | RO | 17.11.2010 | SE | 17.11.2010 | SI | 17.11.2010 | SK | 17.11.2010 | TR | 17.11.2010 | BG | 17.02.2011 | GR | 18.02.2011 | ES | 28.02.2011 | IS | 17.03.2011 | PT | 17.03.2011 | CH | 30.06.2011 | IE | 30.06.2011 | LI | 30.06.2011 | LU | 30.06.2011 | MC | 30.06.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 17.11.2010 | |
BE | 17.11.2010 | ||
CY | 17.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 17.11.2010 | ||
DK | 17.11.2010 | ||
EE | 17.11.2010 | ||
FI | 17.11.2010 | ||
IT | 17.11.2010 | ||
LT | 17.11.2010 | ||
PL | 17.11.2010 | ||
RO | 17.11.2010 | ||
SE | 17.11.2010 | ||
SI | 17.11.2010 | ||
SK | 17.11.2010 | ||
TR | 17.11.2010 | ||
BG | 17.02.2011 | ||
GR | 18.02.2011 | ||
ES | 28.02.2011 | ||
IS | 17.03.2011 | ||
PT | 17.03.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
IE | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
LU | 30.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 17.11.2010 | |
BE | 17.11.2010 | ||
CY | 17.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 17.11.2010 | ||
DK | 17.11.2010 | ||
EE | 17.11.2010 | ||
FI | 17.11.2010 | ||
IT | 17.11.2010 | ||
LT | 17.11.2010 | ||
PL | 17.11.2010 | ||
RO | 17.11.2010 | ||
SE | 17.11.2010 | ||
SI | 17.11.2010 | ||
SK | 17.11.2010 | ||
BG | 17.02.2011 | ||
GR | 18.02.2011 | ||
ES | 28.02.2011 | ||
IS | 17.03.2011 | ||
PT | 17.03.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
IE | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
LU | 30.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 17.11.2010 | |
BE | 17.11.2010 | ||
CY | 17.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 17.11.2010 | ||
DK | 17.11.2010 | ||
EE | 17.11.2010 | ||
FI | 17.11.2010 | ||
IT | 17.11.2010 | ||
LT | 17.11.2010 | ||
PL | 17.11.2010 | ||
RO | 17.11.2010 | ||
SE | 17.11.2010 | ||
SI | 17.11.2010 | ||
SK | 17.11.2010 | ||
BG | 17.02.2011 | ||
GR | 18.02.2011 | ||
ES | 28.02.2011 | ||
IS | 17.03.2011 | ||
PT | 17.03.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
IE | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 17.11.2010 | |
BE | 17.11.2010 | ||
CY | 17.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 17.11.2010 | ||
DK | 17.11.2010 | ||
EE | 17.11.2010 | ||
FI | 17.11.2010 | ||
IT | 17.11.2010 | ||
LT | 17.11.2010 | ||
PL | 17.11.2010 | ||
RO | 17.11.2010 | ||
SE | 17.11.2010 | ||
SI | 17.11.2010 | ||
SK | 17.11.2010 | ||
BG | 17.02.2011 | ||
GR | 18.02.2011 | ||
ES | 28.02.2011 | ||
IS | 17.03.2011 | ||
PT | 17.03.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
IE | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
Former [2012/03] | AT | 17.11.2010 | |
BE | 17.11.2010 | ||
CY | 17.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 17.11.2010 | ||
DK | 17.11.2010 | ||
EE | 17.11.2010 | ||
FI | 17.11.2010 | ||
IT | 17.11.2010 | ||
LT | 17.11.2010 | ||
PL | 17.11.2010 | ||
RO | 17.11.2010 | ||
SE | 17.11.2010 | ||
SI | 17.11.2010 | ||
SK | 17.11.2010 | ||
BG | 17.02.2011 | ||
GR | 18.02.2011 | ||
ES | 28.02.2011 | ||
IS | 17.03.2011 | ||
PT | 17.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 17.11.2010 | |
BE | 17.11.2010 | ||
CY | 17.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 17.11.2010 | ||
DK | 17.11.2010 | ||
EE | 17.11.2010 | ||
FI | 17.11.2010 | ||
LT | 17.11.2010 | ||
PL | 17.11.2010 | ||
RO | 17.11.2010 | ||
SE | 17.11.2010 | ||
SI | 17.11.2010 | ||
SK | 17.11.2010 | ||
BG | 17.02.2011 | ||
GR | 18.02.2011 | ||
ES | 28.02.2011 | ||
IS | 17.03.2011 | ||
PT | 17.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 17.11.2010 | |
BE | 17.11.2010 | ||
CY | 17.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 17.11.2010 | ||
EE | 17.11.2010 | ||
FI | 17.11.2010 | ||
LT | 17.11.2010 | ||
SE | 17.11.2010 | ||
SI | 17.11.2010 | ||
BG | 17.02.2011 | ||
GR | 18.02.2011 | ||
ES | 28.02.2011 | ||
IS | 17.03.2011 | ||
PT | 17.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/32] | AT | 17.11.2010 | |
BE | 17.11.2010 | ||
CY | 17.11.2010 | ||
FI | 17.11.2010 | ||
LT | 17.11.2010 | ||
SE | 17.11.2010 | ||
SI | 17.11.2010 | ||
BG | 17.02.2011 | ||
GR | 18.02.2011 | ||
ES | 28.02.2011 | ||
IS | 17.03.2011 | ||
PT | 17.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | AT | 17.11.2010 | |
CY | 17.11.2010 | ||
FI | 17.11.2010 | ||
LT | 17.11.2010 | ||
SE | 17.11.2010 | ||
SI | 17.11.2010 | ||
BG | 17.02.2011 | ||
GR | 18.02.2011 | ||
IS | 17.03.2011 | ||
PT | 17.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/23] | FI | 17.11.2010 | |
LT | 17.11.2010 | ||
IS | 17.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/19] | LT | 17.11.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US4479566 (ISHII HIROYUKI [JP]); | [DA]US5368133 (YANG SUNG-WANG [TW]); | [XA]US2004178025 (ZWEIDECK BRUNO [FR]) [X] 1,21,22 * page 3, paragraph 64 - page 4, paragraph 89; figure - * [A] 2,4,9,23-25 | by applicant | US4479566 | US5368133 |