EP1592146 - Transmission power correcting method, mobile communications system and mobile station [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.11.2006 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.11.2006 | Withdrawal of application | published on 20.12.2006 [2006/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2006/18] |
Former [2005/44] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takano, Michiaki c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2005/44] | Representative(s) | Sajda, Wolf E., et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/44] | Sajda, Wolf E., et al MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05014468.2 | 30.10.2002 | [2005/44] | Priority number, date | JP20020029585 | 06.02.2002 Original published format: JP 2002029585 | [2005/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1592146 | Date: | 02.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1592146 | Date: | 04.01.2006 | [2006/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/005, H04L1/00 | [2006/01] | CPC: |
H04W52/265 (EP,US);
H04W52/143 (EP,US);
H04W52/24 (EP,US);
H04W52/241 (EP,US);
H04W52/247 (EP,US);
H04W52/262 (EP,US);
H04W52/267 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2005/44] | H04B7/005 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/44] | Title | German: | Methode zur Regelung der Sendeleistung, mobiles Kommunikationssystem und Mobilstation | [2005/44] | English: | Transmission power correcting method, mobile communications system and mobile station | [2005/44] | French: | Procédé pour la commande de la puissance de transmission, système de communication mobile et station mobile | [2005/44] | Examination procedure | 04.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/44] | 27.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.11.2006 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2006/51] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02024515.5 / EP1339175 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0887948 (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI]) [A] 1-5 * abstract * * page 2, line 48 - line 56 * * page 3, line 12 - line 15 ** page 3, line 33 - line 52 *; | [A]US5982813 (DUTTA SANTANU [US], et al) [A] 1-5 * abstract * * column 3, line 5 - line 8 * * column 3, line 34 - line 50 * * column 4, line 1 - line 15 * * column 5, line 49 - line 62 * * column 6, line 41 - line 46 * * column 7, line 28 - line 37 * * column 10, line 54 - line 64 * * figures 1,2,7,8 *; | [Y]US6262994 (DIRSCHEDL WERNER [DE], et al) [Y] 1-5 * abstract * * column 1, line 36 - line 48 * * column 1, line 63 - line 67 * * column 2, line 29 - line 58 * * column 3, line 6 - line 8 * * figure 1 *; | [Y]EP1158715 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC INF TECH [NL]) [Y] 1-5 * column 2, line 6 - line 12 * * column 2, line 44 - line 51 * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0023] * * column 5, line 20 - line 42 * * figures 3,4 * |