EP1741685 - Porous beta-SiC containing shaped ceramic body and method of making it. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.03.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MANN+HUMMEL Innenraumfilter GmbH & Co. KG Helmut-Sandler-Strasse 6 95482 Gefrees / DE | [2008/51] |
Former [2007/02] | For all designated states helsa-automotive GmbH & Co. KG Helmut-Sandler-Strasse 6 95482 Gefrees / DE | ||
For all designated states Friedrich-Alexander-Universität Erlangen-Nürnberg Schlossplatz 4 91054 Erlangen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Weisensel, Lars Schillerstrasse 17 63867 Johannesberg / DE | 02 /
Greil, Peter Am Hockstock 27 91085 Weisendorf / DE | 03 /
Sieber, Heino Bonhoeffner Str. 7 91085 Weisendorf / DE | 04 /
Thomas Wolff Gerhart-Hauptmann-Str. 54 95213 Münchberg / DE | [2014/17] |
Former [2007/10] | 01 /
Weisensel, Lars Schillerstrasse 17 63867 Johannesberg / DE | ||
02 /
Greil, Peter Am Hockstock 27 91085 Weisendorf / DE | |||
03 /
Sieber, Heino Bonhoeffner Str. 7 85051 Ingolstadt / DE | |||
04 /
Thomas Wolff Gerhart-hauptmann-Str. 54 95213 Münchberg / DE | |||
Former [2007/02] | 01 /
Weisensel, Lars Rassthaler Weg 9a 97729 Ramsthal / DE | ||
02 /
Greil, Peter Am Hockstock 27 91085 Weisendorf / DE | |||
03 /
Sieber, Heino Bonhoeffner Str. 7 85051 Ingolstadt / DE | |||
04 /
Thomas Wolff Gerhart-hauptmann-Str. 54 95213 Münchberg / DE | Representative(s) | Walcher, Armin Louis Pöhlau Lohrentz Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Merianstraße 26 90409 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/18] | Walcher, Armin Louis, Pöhlau, Lohrentz Postfach 3055 90014 Nürnberg / DE | ||
Former [2007/02] | Walcher, Armin Louis, Pöhlau, Lohrentz Postfach 3055 90014 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 05014531.7 | 05.07.2005 | [2007/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1741685 | Date: | 10.01.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1741685 | Date: | 30.04.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C04B35/573, C04B38/00, F01N3/022, B01D53/94, B01D46/24 | [2007/02] | CPC: |
C04B35/573 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24149 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24165 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/02] | Title | German: | Poröser beta-SiC-haltiger keramischer Formkörper und Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung. | [2013/46] | English: | Porous beta-SiC containing shaped ceramic body and method of making it. | [2007/02] | French: | Corps formé céramique poreux contenant beta-SiC et son procédé de préparation. | [2007/02] |
Former [2007/02] | Poröser beta-SIC-haltiger keramischer Formkörper und Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung | Examination procedure | 08.07.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.08.2006 | Examination requested [2007/02] | 08.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.09.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.02.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.12.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.03.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 18.03.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.03.2007 | Opposition(s) | 02.02.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.07.2005 | CY | 30.04.2014 | CZ | 30.04.2014 | DK | 30.04.2014 | EE | 30.04.2014 | ES | 30.04.2014 | FI | 30.04.2014 | IT | 30.04.2014 | LT | 30.04.2014 | LV | 30.04.2014 | MC | 30.04.2014 | NL | 30.04.2014 | PL | 30.04.2014 | RO | 30.04.2014 | SE | 30.04.2014 | SI | 30.04.2014 | SK | 30.04.2014 | TR | 30.04.2014 | AT | 05.07.2014 | IE | 05.07.2014 | LU | 05.07.2014 | BG | 30.07.2014 | GB | 30.07.2014 | BE | 31.07.2014 | CH | 31.07.2014 | GR | 31.07.2014 | LI | 31.07.2014 | IS | 30.08.2014 | PT | 01.09.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 05.07.2005 | |
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 30.04.2014 | ||
DK | 30.04.2014 | ||
EE | 30.04.2014 | ||
ES | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
IT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
MC | 30.04.2014 | ||
NL | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
RO | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
SI | 30.04.2014 | ||
SK | 30.04.2014 | ||
AT | 05.07.2014 | ||
IE | 05.07.2014 | ||
LU | 05.07.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
GB | 30.07.2014 | ||
BE | 31.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
Former [2016/21] | CY | 30.04.2014 | |
CZ | 30.04.2014 | ||
DK | 30.04.2014 | ||
EE | 30.04.2014 | ||
ES | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
IT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
MC | 30.04.2014 | ||
NL | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
RO | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
SI | 30.04.2014 | ||
SK | 30.04.2014 | ||
AT | 05.07.2014 | ||
IE | 05.07.2014 | ||
LU | 05.07.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
GB | 30.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/51] | CY | 30.04.2014 | |
CZ | 30.04.2014 | ||
DK | 30.04.2014 | ||
EE | 30.04.2014 | ||
ES | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
IT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
NL | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
RO | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
SI | 30.04.2014 | ||
SK | 30.04.2014 | ||
AT | 05.07.2014 | ||
IE | 05.07.2014 | ||
LU | 05.07.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
GB | 30.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/37] | CY | 30.04.2014 | |
CZ | 30.04.2014 | ||
DK | 30.04.2014 | ||
EE | 30.04.2014 | ||
ES | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
IT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
NL | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
RO | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
SI | 30.04.2014 | ||
SK | 30.04.2014 | ||
IE | 05.07.2014 | ||
LU | 05.07.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
GB | 30.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CY | 30.04.2014 | |
CZ | 30.04.2014 | ||
DK | 30.04.2014 | ||
EE | 30.04.2014 | ||
ES | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
IT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
NL | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
RO | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
SI | 30.04.2014 | ||
SK | 30.04.2014 | ||
LU | 05.07.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
GB | 30.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 30.04.2014 | |
CZ | 30.04.2014 | ||
DK | 30.04.2014 | ||
EE | 30.04.2014 | ||
ES | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
IT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
NL | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
RO | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
SK | 30.04.2014 | ||
LU | 05.07.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
GB | 30.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | CY | 30.04.2014 | |
CZ | 30.04.2014 | ||
DK | 30.04.2014 | ||
EE | 30.04.2014 | ||
ES | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
IT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
NL | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
RO | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
SK | 30.04.2014 | ||
LU | 05.07.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | CY | 30.04.2014 | |
CZ | 30.04.2014 | ||
DK | 30.04.2014 | ||
EE | 30.04.2014 | ||
ES | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
IT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
NL | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
RO | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
SK | 30.04.2014 | ||
LU | 05.07.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/13] | CY | 30.04.2014 | |
CZ | 30.04.2014 | ||
DK | 30.04.2014 | ||
EE | 30.04.2014 | ||
ES | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
NL | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
RO | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
SK | 30.04.2014 | ||
LU | 05.07.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 30.04.2014 | |
CZ | 30.04.2014 | ||
DK | 30.04.2014 | ||
EE | 30.04.2014 | ||
ES | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
NL | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
RO | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
SK | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | CY | 30.04.2014 | |
CZ | 30.04.2014 | ||
DK | 30.04.2014 | ||
EE | 30.04.2014 | ||
ES | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
NL | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
SK | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | CY | 30.04.2014 | |
DK | 30.04.2014 | ||
ES | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
NL | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | CY | 30.04.2014 | |
ES | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
NL | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 30.04.2014 | |
ES | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
NL | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 30.04.2014 | |
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 30.04.2014 | |
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 30.04.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4514346 (LUHLEICH HARTMUT [DE], et al); | [X]US5474587 (DIAS FRANCISCO J [DE], et al); | [X]US2002011683 (GADKAREE KISHOR P [US], et al); | [X]US2003012938 (BAUER MORITZ [DE], et al); | [DX]US6582796 (JOULIN JEAN PIERRE [FR], et al); | [X]EP1544184 (NAT INST OF ADVANCED IND SCIEN [JP]); | Examination | WO0001463 | by applicant | US4777152 | DE3719606 | DE4025239 | WO9313303 | DE19727115 | DE19711831 | EP0657403 | WO0198207 | DE69429323T | DE10104882 | EP0796830 | US6582796 | DE10213016 |