EP1630091 - Gear-shifting apparatus for a bicycle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.05.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.06.2009 [2009/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HONDA MOTOR CO., LTD. 1-1, Minamiaoyama 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2008/28] |
Former [2006/09] | For all designated states HONDA MOTOR CO., Ltd. 1-1, Minamiaoyama 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Matsumoto, Shinya c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 4-1 Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama / JP | 02 /
Iguchi, Kazunari c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 4-1 Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama / JP | [2008/10] |
Former [2006/09] | 01 /
Matsumoto, Shinya c/o K. K. Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 4-1 Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama / JP | ||
02 /
Iguchi, Kazunari c/o K. K. Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 4-1 Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama / JP | Representative(s) | Rupp, Christian, et al Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/09] | Rupp, Christian, et al Mitscherlich & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05014687.7 | 06.07.2005 | [2006/09] | Priority number, date | JP20040249311 | 27.08.2004 Original published format: JP 2004249311 | JP20040249312 | 27.08.2004 Original published format: JP 2004249312 | [2006/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1630091 | Date: | 01.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1630091 | Date: | 09.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B62M9/04, B62M9/12, B62M9/16 | [2006/09] | CPC: |
B62M9/04 (EP,US);
B62M9/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2006/45] |
Former [2006/09] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Gangschaltungsvorrichtung für ein Fahrrad | [2006/09] | English: | Gear-shifting apparatus for a bicycle | [2006/09] | French: | Dispositif de changement de vitesse pour bicyclette | [2006/09] | Examination procedure | 06.07.2005 | Examination requested [2006/09] | 21.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.05.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 07.05.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.04.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4058020 (HURET ROGER, et al) [A] 1,7,11,16 * column 4 - column 6; figure - *; | [A]US4384864 (BONNARD PIERRE [FR]) [A] 10,12 * figures 33-40 *; | [A]DE4129198 (MUELLER HEINZ [DE], et al) [A] 1,7,11,16* the whole document *; | [A]US2004014543 (VAN DER LINDE FREDDY [CA]) [A] 1,7,11,16 * the whole document *; | [X]EP1418120 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-11,13-18 * figures 2-4 *; | [E]EP1564126 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [E] 1-18 * figures 4-6,10a *; | [E]EP1564128 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [E] 1-18 * figures 9,13,18 * | by applicant | JP2004155280 |