Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
20.04.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.05.2007 [2007/21] |
07.12.2006 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
01.09.2006 | New entry: Period of grace R.85a / R.108(3) EPC1973: despatch of communication + time limit | |
01.09.2006 | New entry: Period of grace R.85b EPC 1973: despatch of communication + time limit | |
01.09.2006 | Definitive list of designations | published on 04.10.2006 [2006/40] |
16.12.2005 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 01.02.2006 [2006/05] |