EP1622223 - Electrical connector for vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.04.2007 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.04.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.05.2007 [2007/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fahrzeugelektrik Pirna GmbH & Co. KG Hugo-Küttner-Strasse 8 01796 Pirna / DE | [2006/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Eichler, Olaf Marienberger Str. 59 K 01279 Dresden / DE | 02 /
Osterode, Wolfgang Otto-Gedlich-Str. 28 01796 Pirna / DE | [2006/05] | Representative(s) | Schulz, Rütger, et al Mitscherlich & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 33 06 09 80066 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/05] | Schulz, Rütger, et al Patentanwälte Mitscherlich & Partner, Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05014690.1 | 06.07.2005 | [2006/05] | Priority number, date | DE20042011704U | 26.07.2004 Original published format: DE 202004011704 U | [2006/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1622223 | Date: | 01.02.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H01R4/48 | [2006/05] | CPC: |
H01R4/4821 (EP,US);
H01R4/4816 (EP,US);
H01R4/4842 (EP,US);
H01R9/2491 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2006/40] |
Former [2006/05] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Elektrische Verbindungsvorrichtung für Kraftfahrzeuge | [2006/05] | English: | Electrical connector for vehicles | [2006/05] | French: | Connecteur électrique pour véhicules | [2006/05] | Examination procedure | 02.08.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/21] | 13.12.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2007/21] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 07.09.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.09.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.09.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 07.09.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 07.09.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 07.09.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 07.09.2006 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.09.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 07.09.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.09.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 07.09.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 07.09.2006 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 07.09.2006 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 07.09.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 07.09.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 07.09.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.09.2006 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 07.09.2006 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.09.2006 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.09.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 07.09.2006 | LV   M01   Not yet paid | 07.09.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 07.09.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 07.09.2006 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 07.09.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.09.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 07.09.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.09.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 07.09.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 07.09.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 07.09.2006 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US3748634 (BARNES R, et al); | [Y]EP0544630 (MENBER S SPA [IT]); | [XY]DE19610958 (WEIDMUELLER INTERFACE [DE]); | [Y]DE19715971 (PHOENIX CONTACT GMBH & CO [DE]); | [XY]DE19833610 (ALOYS MENNEKES ANLAGEN [DE]); | [Y]US6478619 (WIECHMANN WAYNE [US]) |