EP1741758 - Colour composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 04.03.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zellaerosol GmbH Wiesenstrasse 13 79669 Zell im Wiesental / DE | [2007/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fessmann, Peter Wiesenstrasse 11 79669 Zell im Wiesental / DE | 02 /
Rösch, Peter Markgrafenstrasse 35 79541 Lörrach / DE | [2007/10] |
Former [2007/02] | 01 /
Fessmann, Peter Wiesenstrasse 11 79669 Zell im Wiesental / DE | Representative(s) | Richter, Joachim RGTH Patentanwälte PartGmbB Neuer Wall 10 20354 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/02] | Richter, Joachim Richter, Werdermann, Gerbaulet & Hofmann Neuer Wall 10 20354 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 05014860.0 | 08.07.2005 | [2007/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1741758 | Date: | 10.01.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/02] | Type: | A8 Corrected patent application | No.: | EP1741758 | Date: | 07.03.2007 | [2007/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1741758 | Date: | 05.11.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C09D5/00 | [2007/02] | CPC: |
C09D5/021 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/02] | Title | German: | Farbzubereitung | [2007/02] | English: | Colour composition | [2007/02] | French: | Composition de couleur | [2007/02] | Examination procedure | 19.01.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.01.2006 | Examination requested [2007/02] | 23.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.07.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.09.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 17.09.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
13.02.2009
20.02.2009
ADMISSIBLE MOTIP DUPLI GmbH Kurt-Vogelsang-Strasse 6 74855 Hassmersheim / DE Opponent's representative Ullrich & Naumann PartG mbB Schneidmühlstrasse 21 69115 Heidelberg / DE | 02
30.06.2009
07.07.2009
ADMISSIBLE Mercalin AB Box 13007 402 51 Göteborg / SE Opponent's representative Friberg, Ingvar, et al, et al Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/22] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
13.02.2009
20.02.2009
ADMISSIBLE MOTIP DUPLI GmbH Kurt-Vogelsang-Strasse 6 74855 Hassmersheim / DE Opponent's representative Ullrich & Naumann Luisenstraße 14 69115 Heidelberg / DE | ||
02
30.06.2009
07.07.2009
ADMISSIBLE Mercalin AB Box 13007 402 51 Göteborg / SE Opponent's representative Friberg, Ingvar, et al, et al Albihns.Zacco Torggatan 8 Box 142 401 22 Göteborg / SE | |||
Former [2009/32] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
13.02.2009
20.02.2009
ADMISSIBLE MOTIP DUPLI GmbH Kurt-Vogelsang-Strasse 6 74855 Hassmersheim / DE Opponent's representative Ullrich & Naumann Luisenstraße 14 69115 Heidelberg / DE | ||
02
30.06.2009
Geveko AB/Mercalin AB Box 13007 402 51 Göteborg / SE Opponent's representative Friberg, Ingvar, et al, et al Albihns AB P.O. Box 142 401 22 Göteborg / SE | |||
Former [2009/13] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
13.02.2009
MOTIP DUPLI GmbH Kurt-Vogelsang-Strasse 6 74855 Hassmersheim / DE Opponent's representative Ullrich & Naumann Luisenstraße 14 69115 Heidelberg / DE | 09.09.2009 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 11.01.2010 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 27.10.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 27.10.2010 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2011/14] | 17.11.2010 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 17.11.2010 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 05.11.2008 | CY | 05.11.2008 | CZ | 05.11.2008 | DK | 05.11.2008 | EE | 05.11.2008 | FI | 05.11.2008 | IE | 05.11.2008 | IT | 05.11.2008 | LI | 05.11.2008 | LT | 05.11.2008 | LV | 05.11.2008 | NL | 05.11.2008 | RO | 05.11.2008 | SI | 05.11.2008 | SK | 05.11.2008 | TR | 05.11.2008 | BG | 05.02.2009 | SE | 05.02.2009 | GR | 06.02.2009 | ES | 16.02.2009 | IS | 05.03.2009 | PT | 06.04.2009 | HU | 06.05.2009 | GB | 08.07.2009 | LU | 08.07.2009 | BE | 31.07.2009 | MC | 31.07.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/32] | CH | 05.11.2008 | |
CZ | 05.11.2008 | ||
DK | 05.11.2008 | ||
EE | 05.11.2008 | ||
FI | 05.11.2008 | ||
IE | 05.11.2008 | ||
IT | 05.11.2008 | ||
LI | 05.11.2008 | ||
LT | 05.11.2008 | ||
LV | 05.11.2008 | ||
NL | 05.11.2008 | ||
RO | 05.11.2008 | ||
SI | 05.11.2008 | ||
SK | 05.11.2008 | ||
BG | 05.02.2009 | ||
SE | 05.02.2009 | ||
GR | 06.02.2009 | ||
ES | 16.02.2009 | ||
IS | 05.03.2009 | ||
PT | 06.04.2009 | ||
HU | 06.05.2009 | ||
GB | 08.07.2009 | ||
LU | 08.07.2009 | ||
BE | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | CH | 05.11.2008 | |
CZ | 05.11.2008 | ||
DK | 05.11.2008 | ||
EE | 05.11.2008 | ||
FI | 05.11.2008 | ||
IE | 05.11.2008 | ||
IT | 05.11.2008 | ||
LI | 05.11.2008 | ||
LT | 05.11.2008 | ||
LV | 05.11.2008 | ||
NL | 05.11.2008 | ||
RO | 05.11.2008 | ||
SI | 05.11.2008 | ||
SK | 05.11.2008 | ||
BG | 05.02.2009 | ||
SE | 05.02.2009 | ||
GR | 06.02.2009 | ||
ES | 16.02.2009 | ||
IS | 05.03.2009 | ||
PT | 06.04.2009 | ||
GB | 08.07.2009 | ||
LU | 08.07.2009 | ||
BE | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2011/20] | CH | 05.11.2008 | |
CZ | 05.11.2008 | ||
DK | 05.11.2008 | ||
EE | 05.11.2008 | ||
FI | 05.11.2008 | ||
IE | 05.11.2008 | ||
IT | 05.11.2008 | ||
LI | 05.11.2008 | ||
LT | 05.11.2008 | ||
LV | 05.11.2008 | ||
NL | 05.11.2008 | ||
RO | 05.11.2008 | ||
SI | 05.11.2008 | ||
SK | 05.11.2008 | ||
BG | 05.02.2009 | ||
SE | 05.02.2009 | ||
GR | 06.02.2009 | ||
ES | 16.02.2009 | ||
IS | 05.03.2009 | ||
PT | 06.04.2009 | ||
GB | 08.07.2009 | ||
BE | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2011/15] | CZ | 05.11.2008 | |
DK | 05.11.2008 | ||
EE | 05.11.2008 | ||
FI | 05.11.2008 | ||
IE | 05.11.2008 | ||
IT | 05.11.2008 | ||
LT | 05.11.2008 | ||
LV | 05.11.2008 | ||
NL | 05.11.2008 | ||
RO | 05.11.2008 | ||
SI | 05.11.2008 | ||
SK | 05.11.2008 | ||
BG | 05.02.2009 | ||
SE | 05.02.2009 | ||
GR | 06.02.2009 | ||
ES | 16.02.2009 | ||
IS | 05.03.2009 | ||
PT | 06.04.2009 | ||
GB | 08.07.2009 | ||
BE | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/51] | CZ | 05.11.2008 | |
DK | 05.11.2008 | ||
EE | 05.11.2008 | ||
FI | 05.11.2008 | ||
IE | 05.11.2008 | ||
LT | 05.11.2008 | ||
LV | 05.11.2008 | ||
NL | 05.11.2008 | ||
RO | 05.11.2008 | ||
SI | 05.11.2008 | ||
SK | 05.11.2008 | ||
BG | 05.02.2009 | ||
SE | 05.02.2009 | ||
GR | 06.02.2009 | ||
ES | 16.02.2009 | ||
IS | 05.03.2009 | ||
PT | 06.04.2009 | ||
GB | 08.07.2009 | ||
BE | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/29] | CZ | 05.11.2008 | |
DK | 05.11.2008 | ||
EE | 05.11.2008 | ||
FI | 05.11.2008 | ||
IE | 05.11.2008 | ||
LT | 05.11.2008 | ||
LV | 05.11.2008 | ||
NL | 05.11.2008 | ||
RO | 05.11.2008 | ||
SI | 05.11.2008 | ||
SK | 05.11.2008 | ||
BG | 05.02.2009 | ||
SE | 05.02.2009 | ||
ES | 16.02.2009 | ||
IS | 05.03.2009 | ||
PT | 06.04.2009 | ||
GB | 08.07.2009 | ||
BE | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/25] | CZ | 05.11.2008 | |
DK | 05.11.2008 | ||
EE | 05.11.2008 | ||
FI | 05.11.2008 | ||
IE | 05.11.2008 | ||
LT | 05.11.2008 | ||
LV | 05.11.2008 | ||
NL | 05.11.2008 | ||
RO | 05.11.2008 | ||
SI | 05.11.2008 | ||
SK | 05.11.2008 | ||
BG | 05.02.2009 | ||
SE | 05.02.2009 | ||
ES | 16.02.2009 | ||
IS | 05.03.2009 | ||
PT | 06.04.2009 | ||
GB | 08.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/11] | CZ | 05.11.2008 | |
DK | 05.11.2008 | ||
EE | 05.11.2008 | ||
FI | 05.11.2008 | ||
IE | 05.11.2008 | ||
LT | 05.11.2008 | ||
LV | 05.11.2008 | ||
NL | 05.11.2008 | ||
RO | 05.11.2008 | ||
SI | 05.11.2008 | ||
SK | 05.11.2008 | ||
BG | 05.02.2009 | ||
SE | 05.02.2009 | ||
ES | 16.02.2009 | ||
IS | 05.03.2009 | ||
PT | 06.04.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2009/45] | CZ | 05.11.2008 | |
DK | 05.11.2008 | ||
EE | 05.11.2008 | ||
FI | 05.11.2008 | ||
IE | 05.11.2008 | ||
LT | 05.11.2008 | ||
LV | 05.11.2008 | ||
NL | 05.11.2008 | ||
RO | 05.11.2008 | ||
SI | 05.11.2008 | ||
SK | 05.11.2008 | ||
BG | 05.02.2009 | ||
SE | 05.02.2009 | ||
ES | 16.02.2009 | ||
IS | 05.03.2009 | ||
PT | 06.04.2009 | ||
Former [2009/41] | CZ | 05.11.2008 | |
DK | 05.11.2008 | ||
EE | 05.11.2008 | ||
FI | 05.11.2008 | ||
IE | 05.11.2008 | ||
LT | 05.11.2008 | ||
LV | 05.11.2008 | ||
NL | 05.11.2008 | ||
RO | 05.11.2008 | ||
SI | 05.11.2008 | ||
BG | 05.02.2009 | ||
SE | 05.02.2009 | ||
ES | 16.02.2009 | ||
IS | 05.03.2009 | ||
PT | 06.04.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | DK | 05.11.2008 | |
EE | 05.11.2008 | ||
FI | 05.11.2008 | ||
IE | 05.11.2008 | ||
LT | 05.11.2008 | ||
LV | 05.11.2008 | ||
NL | 05.11.2008 | ||
RO | 05.11.2008 | ||
SI | 05.11.2008 | ||
BG | 05.02.2009 | ||
ES | 16.02.2009 | ||
IS | 05.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/27] | FI | 05.11.2008 | |
LT | 05.11.2008 | ||
LV | 05.11.2008 | ||
NL | 05.11.2008 | ||
SI | 05.11.2008 | ||
ES | 16.02.2009 | ||
IS | 05.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/24] | FI | 05.11.2008 | |
LT | 05.11.2008 | ||
ES | 16.02.2009 | ||
IS | 05.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/21] | LT | 05.11.2008 | |
ES | 16.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/20] | ES | 16.02.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3919451 (LEVY JEROME F, et al) [X] 1-26 * column 10 - column 11; examples 3,8; table I *; | [X]US2004258627 (RIEDEL HEIDI [DE], et al) [X] 1-26* paragraphs [0036] , [0076] , [0103] - [0106] - [0151] * |