EP1617089 - Linear guide apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 03.07.2009 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 05.08.2009 [2009/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NSK Ltd. 6-3, Ohsaki 1-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | For all designated states NSK Precision Co., Ltd. 6-3 Ohsaki 1-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/03] | For all designated states NSK Ltd. 6-3, Ohsaki 1-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
For all designated states NSK Precision Co., Ltd. 6-3 Ohsaki 1-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakano, Kenta NSK Precision Co., Ltd. 78, Toriba-machi Maebashi-shi Gunma / JP | [2006/03] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/03] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05015145.5 | 12.07.2005 | [2006/03] | Priority number, date | JP20040205834 | 13.07.2004 Original published format: JP 2004205834 | [2006/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1617089 | Date: | 18.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/03] | Classification | IPC: | F16C29/06, F16C33/58 | [2006/03] | CPC: |
F16C29/0635 (EP,US);
F16C29/0604 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/03] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Linearführungslager | [2006/03] | English: | Linear guide apparatus | [2006/03] | French: | Palier de guide linéaire | [2006/03] | Examination procedure | 24.06.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | by applicant | JP2003035314 |