EP1628485 - Encoding method and decoding method for a moving picture [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 06.02.2015 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.02.2015 | Refusal of application | published on 11.03.2015 [2015/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NTT DoCoMo, Inc. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/08] | For all designated states NTT DoCoMo, Inc. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Suzuki, Yoshinori c/o NTT DoCoMo, Inc. 11-1, Nagata-cho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku 100-6150 Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Boon, Choon Seng c/o NTT DoCoMo, Inc. 11-1, Nagata-cho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku 100-6150 Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Horikoshi, Tsutomo c/o NTT DoCoMo, Inc. 11-1, Nagata-cho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku 100-6150 Tokyo / JP | [2006/08] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Brauhaus 8 01099 Dresden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/46] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Am Brauhaus 8 01099 Dresden / DE | ||
Former [2009/36] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/44] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/31] | Grosse - Schumacher - Knauer - von Hirschhausen Nymphenburger Strasse 14 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/30] | Grosse, Wolfgang, et al Grosse - Schumacher - Knauer - von Hirschhausen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Nymphenburger Strasse 14 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/11] | Grosse, Wolfgang, et al Grosse - Schumacher - Knauer - von Hirschhausen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Nymphenburger Strasse 14 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/31] | GROSSE BOCKHORNI SCHUMACHER Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Elsenheimerstrasse 49 80687 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/08] | Grosse, Wolfgang, et al Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Grosse, Bockhorni & Schumacher, Forstenrieder Allee 59 81476 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05015229.7 | 13.07.2005 | [2006/08] | Priority number, date | JP20040207790 | 14.07.2004 Original published format: JP 2004207790 | JP20040216384 | 23.07.2004 Original published format: JP 2004216384 | [2006/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1628485 | Date: | 22.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1628485 | Date: | 15.07.2009 | [2009/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04N13/00, H04N7/26, H04N7/50 | [2009/29] | CPC: |
H04N19/597 (EP,US);
H04N19/42 (KR);
H04N13/139 (EP,US);
H04N13/161 (EP,US);
H04N13/178 (EP,US);
H04N19/61 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/08] | H04N7/26, H04N7/50, H04N13/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/08] | Title | German: | Codierungsverfahren und Decodierungsverfahren für ein Bewegtbild | [2006/08] | English: | Encoding method and decoding method for a moving picture | [2006/08] | French: | Procédé de codage et procédé de décodage pour une image en mouvement | [2006/08] | Examination procedure | 13.07.2005 | Examination requested [2006/08] | 29.09.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.11.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.03.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.09.2014 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2015/11] | 10.09.2014 | Date of oral proceedings | 09.10.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2015/11] | 09.10.2014 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | EP12159229.9 / EP2477410 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.11.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US6055012 (HASKELL BARIN GEOFFRY [US], et al) [Y] 4-6,10-12,16-18 * figure 1; claim 14 ** page 13, lines 43-51 *; | [XY]US2003053797 (OSHIMA MITSUAKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,7-9,13-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0063] - [0113]; figures 1,5,13 * * claims 26-34,37,38 * [Y] 4-6,10-12,16-18; | [XY]US2004066846 (YUN KUGJIN [KR], et al) [X] 1-3,7-9,13-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0004] , [0005] * * paragraphs [0060] - [0101] * [Y] 4-6,10-12,16-18 |