EP1593683 - Dihydro-2,3-Benzodiazepine derivatives [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.02.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.02.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.03.2010 [2010/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELI LILLY AND COMPANY Lilly Corporate Center Indianapolis, IN 46285 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/45] | For all designated states ELI LILLY AND COMPANY Lilly Corporate Center Indianapolis IN 46285 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Anderson, Benjamin Alan 1644 Catalina Way Zionsville, IN 46077 / US | 02 /
Hansen, Marvin Martin 6409 Forrest Commons Boulevard Indianapolis, IN 46227 / US | 03 /
Harn, Nancy Kay 2131 Braeburn East Drive Indianapolis, IN 46219 / US | [2005/45] | Representative(s) | Schnappauf, Georg, et al ZSP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Hansastraße 32 80686 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/45] | Schnappauf, Georg, et al Dr. Volker Vossius Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Geibelstrasse 6 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05015260.2 | 30.08.1995 | [2005/45] | Priority number, date | US19940298645 | 31.08.1994 Original published format: US 298645 | US19950413029 | 28.03.1995 Original published format: US 413029 | [2005/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1593683 | Date: | 09.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1593683 | Date: | 25.10.2006 | [2006/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C07D491/04, A61K31/551, A61P25/08 | [2005/45] | CPC: |
C07D491/04 (EP,US);
A61P13/02 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P21/00 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P25/08 (EP);
A61P25/20 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
C07D317/58 (EP,US);
C07D493/04 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2005/45] | Title | German: | Dihydro-2,3-Benzodiazepinderivate | [2005/45] | English: | Dihydro-2,3-Benzodiazepine derivatives | [2005/45] | French: | Dérivés de dihydro-2,3-benzodiazépine | [2005/45] | Examination procedure | 13.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/45] | 11.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.09.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/13] | 10.11.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/13] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01114686.7 / EP1157992 | EP95930998.0 / EP0771198 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 13.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 07.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 14.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 25.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 24.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]EP0492485 (GYOGYSZERKUTATO INTEZET [HU]) [DA] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9211262 (GYOGYSZERKUTATO INTEZET [HU]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [PA]WO9501357 (GYOGYSZERKUTATO INTEZET [HU], et al) [PA] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [PA] - LING I ET AL, "ASYMMETRIC REDUCTION OF A CARBON-NITROGEN DOUBLE BOND: ENANTIOSELECTIVE SYNTHESIS OF 4,5-DIHYDRO-3H-2,3-BENZODIAZEPINES", JOURNAL OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY, PERKIN TRANSACTIONS 1, CHEMICAL SOCIETY. LETCHWORTH, GB, (19950607), no. 11, ISSN 0300-922X, pages 1423 - 1428, XP000611808 [PA] 1-13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/p19950001423 |