EP1619299 - Extended-nip press [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.01.2010 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Andritz Küsters GmbH Eduard-Küsters-Strasse 1 47805 Krefeld / DE | [2009/11] |
Former [2007/50] | For all designated states Andritz Küsters GmbH Eduard-Küsters-Str. 1 47805 Krefeld / DE | ||
Former [2006/35] | For all designated states Andritz Küsters GmbH & Co. KG Eduard-Küsters-Strasse 1 47805 Krefeld / DE | ||
Former [2006/04] | For all designated states Eduard Küsters Maschinenfabrik GmbH & Co. KG Eduard-Küsters-Strasse 1 47805 Krefeld / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mark, Wolfgang Mittelstrasse 93 40668 Meerbusch / DE | 02 /
Gross, Ralf Steinheide 59 47918 Tönisvorst / DE | 03 /
Höhne, Axel Wehmstrasse 7 47447 Moers / DE | [2006/04] | Representative(s) | Sparing Röhl Henseler Postfach 14 04 43 40074 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/04] | Sparing Röhl Henseler Patentanwälte European Patent Attorneys Postfach 14 04 43 40074 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 05015276.8 | 14.07.2005 | [2006/04] | Priority number, date | DE20041035092 | 20.07.2004 Original published format: DE102004035092 | DE20042013639U | 01.09.2004 Original published format: DE 202004013639 U | [2006/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1619299 | Date: | 25.01.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1619299 | Date: | 11.03.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | D21F3/02 | [2006/04] | CPC: |
D21F3/0218 (EP);
D21F3/0245 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/04] | Title | German: | Langspaltpresse | [2006/04] | English: | Extended-nip press | [2006/04] | French: | Presse à ligne de contact élargie | [2006/04] | Examination procedure | 28.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/37] | 24.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.01.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 09.01.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.12.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 28.07.2006 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   28.07.2006 | 28.07.2006 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   28.07.2006 | 28.07.2006 | BG   M01   Fee paid on   28.07.2006 | 28.07.2006 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   28.07.2006 | 28.07.2006 | CY   M01   Fee paid on   28.07.2006 | 28.07.2006 | CZ   M01   Fee paid on   28.07.2006 | 28.07.2006 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   28.07.2006 | 28.07.2006 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   28.07.2006 | 28.07.2006 | EE   M01   Fee paid on   28.07.2006 | 28.07.2006 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   28.07.2006 | 28.07.2006 | FI   M01   Fee paid on   28.07.2006 | 28.07.2006 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   28.07.2006 | 28.07.2006 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   28.07.2006 | 28.07.2006 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   28.07.2006 | 28.07.2006 | HU   M01   Fee paid on   28.07.2006 | 28.07.2006 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   28.07.2006 | 28.07.2006 | IS   M01   Fee paid on   28.07.2006 | 28.07.2006 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   28.07.2006 | 28.07.2006 | LT   M01   Fee paid on   28.07.2006 | 28.07.2006 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   28.07.2006 | 28.07.2006 | LV   M01   Fee paid on   28.07.2006 | 28.07.2006 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   28.07.2006 | 28.07.2006 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   28.07.2006 | 28.07.2006 | PL   M01   Fee paid on   28.07.2006 | 28.07.2006 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   28.07.2006 | 28.07.2006 | RO   M01   Fee paid on   28.07.2006 | 28.07.2006 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   28.07.2006 | 28.07.2006 | SI   M01   Fee paid on   28.07.2006 | 28.07.2006 | SK   M01   Fee paid on   28.07.2006 | 28.07.2006 | TR   M01   Fee paid on   28.07.2006 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 28.07.2006 | M01   Fee paid on   28.07.2006 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 11.03.2009 | CZ | 11.03.2009 | DK | 11.03.2009 | EE | 11.03.2009 | IE | 11.03.2009 | IT | 11.03.2009 | LT | 11.03.2009 | LV | 11.03.2009 | NL | 11.03.2009 | PL | 11.03.2009 | RO | 11.03.2009 | SI | 11.03.2009 | SK | 11.03.2009 | TR | 11.03.2009 | BG | 11.06.2009 | SE | 11.06.2009 | GR | 12.06.2009 | ES | 22.06.2009 | IS | 11.07.2009 | AT | 14.07.2009 | GB | 14.07.2009 | LU | 14.07.2009 | BE | 31.07.2009 | CH | 31.07.2009 | FR | 31.07.2009 | LI | 31.07.2009 | MC | 31.07.2009 | PT | 24.08.2009 | HU | 12.09.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/32] | CZ | 11.03.2009 | |
DK | 11.03.2009 | ||
EE | 11.03.2009 | ||
IE | 11.03.2009 | ||
IT | 11.03.2009 | ||
LT | 11.03.2009 | ||
LV | 11.03.2009 | ||
NL | 11.03.2009 | ||
PL | 11.03.2009 | ||
RO | 11.03.2009 | ||
SI | 11.03.2009 | ||
SK | 11.03.2009 | ||
BG | 11.06.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
GR | 12.06.2009 | ||
ES | 22.06.2009 | ||
IS | 11.07.2009 | ||
AT | 14.07.2009 | ||
GB | 14.07.2009 | ||
LU | 14.07.2009 | ||
BE | 31.07.2009 | ||
CH | 31.07.2009 | ||
FR | 31.07.2009 | ||
LI | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
PT | 24.08.2009 | ||
HU | 12.09.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | CZ | 11.03.2009 | |
DK | 11.03.2009 | ||
EE | 11.03.2009 | ||
IE | 11.03.2009 | ||
IT | 11.03.2009 | ||
LT | 11.03.2009 | ||
LV | 11.03.2009 | ||
NL | 11.03.2009 | ||
PL | 11.03.2009 | ||
RO | 11.03.2009 | ||
SI | 11.03.2009 | ||
SK | 11.03.2009 | ||
BG | 11.06.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
GR | 12.06.2009 | ||
ES | 22.06.2009 | ||
IS | 11.07.2009 | ||
AT | 14.07.2009 | ||
GB | 14.07.2009 | ||
LU | 14.07.2009 | ||
BE | 31.07.2009 | ||
CH | 31.07.2009 | ||
FR | 31.07.2009 | ||
LI | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
PT | 24.08.2009 | ||
Former [2011/15] | CZ | 11.03.2009 | |
DK | 11.03.2009 | ||
EE | 11.03.2009 | ||
IE | 11.03.2009 | ||
IT | 11.03.2009 | ||
LT | 11.03.2009 | ||
LV | 11.03.2009 | ||
NL | 11.03.2009 | ||
PL | 11.03.2009 | ||
RO | 11.03.2009 | ||
SI | 11.03.2009 | ||
SK | 11.03.2009 | ||
BG | 11.06.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
GR | 12.06.2009 | ||
ES | 22.06.2009 | ||
IS | 11.07.2009 | ||
AT | 14.07.2009 | ||
GB | 14.07.2009 | ||
BE | 31.07.2009 | ||
CH | 31.07.2009 | ||
FR | 31.07.2009 | ||
LI | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
PT | 24.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/51] | CZ | 11.03.2009 | |
DK | 11.03.2009 | ||
EE | 11.03.2009 | ||
IE | 11.03.2009 | ||
LT | 11.03.2009 | ||
LV | 11.03.2009 | ||
NL | 11.03.2009 | ||
PL | 11.03.2009 | ||
RO | 11.03.2009 | ||
SI | 11.03.2009 | ||
SK | 11.03.2009 | ||
BG | 11.06.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
GR | 12.06.2009 | ||
ES | 22.06.2009 | ||
IS | 11.07.2009 | ||
AT | 14.07.2009 | ||
GB | 14.07.2009 | ||
BE | 31.07.2009 | ||
CH | 31.07.2009 | ||
FR | 31.07.2009 | ||
LI | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
PT | 24.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/29] | CZ | 11.03.2009 | |
DK | 11.03.2009 | ||
EE | 11.03.2009 | ||
IE | 11.03.2009 | ||
LT | 11.03.2009 | ||
LV | 11.03.2009 | ||
NL | 11.03.2009 | ||
PL | 11.03.2009 | ||
RO | 11.03.2009 | ||
SI | 11.03.2009 | ||
SK | 11.03.2009 | ||
BG | 11.06.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
ES | 22.06.2009 | ||
IS | 11.07.2009 | ||
GB | 14.07.2009 | ||
BE | 31.07.2009 | ||
CH | 31.07.2009 | ||
FR | 31.07.2009 | ||
LI | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
PT | 24.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/25] | CZ | 11.03.2009 | |
DK | 11.03.2009 | ||
EE | 11.03.2009 | ||
IE | 11.03.2009 | ||
LT | 11.03.2009 | ||
LV | 11.03.2009 | ||
NL | 11.03.2009 | ||
PL | 11.03.2009 | ||
RO | 11.03.2009 | ||
SI | 11.03.2009 | ||
SK | 11.03.2009 | ||
BG | 11.06.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
ES | 22.06.2009 | ||
IS | 11.07.2009 | ||
GB | 14.07.2009 | ||
CH | 31.07.2009 | ||
FR | 31.07.2009 | ||
LI | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
PT | 24.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/23] | CZ | 11.03.2009 | |
DK | 11.03.2009 | ||
EE | 11.03.2009 | ||
IE | 11.03.2009 | ||
LT | 11.03.2009 | ||
LV | 11.03.2009 | ||
NL | 11.03.2009 | ||
PL | 11.03.2009 | ||
RO | 11.03.2009 | ||
SI | 11.03.2009 | ||
SK | 11.03.2009 | ||
BG | 11.06.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
ES | 22.06.2009 | ||
IS | 11.07.2009 | ||
CH | 31.07.2009 | ||
FR | 31.07.2009 | ||
LI | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
PT | 24.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/11] | CZ | 11.03.2009 | |
DK | 11.03.2009 | ||
EE | 11.03.2009 | ||
IE | 11.03.2009 | ||
LT | 11.03.2009 | ||
LV | 11.03.2009 | ||
NL | 11.03.2009 | ||
PL | 11.03.2009 | ||
RO | 11.03.2009 | ||
SI | 11.03.2009 | ||
SK | 11.03.2009 | ||
BG | 11.06.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
ES | 22.06.2009 | ||
IS | 11.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
PT | 24.08.2009 | ||
Former [2009/51] | CZ | 11.03.2009 | |
EE | 11.03.2009 | ||
IE | 11.03.2009 | ||
LT | 11.03.2009 | ||
LV | 11.03.2009 | ||
NL | 11.03.2009 | ||
PL | 11.03.2009 | ||
RO | 11.03.2009 | ||
SI | 11.03.2009 | ||
SK | 11.03.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
ES | 22.06.2009 | ||
IS | 11.07.2009 | ||
PT | 24.08.2009 | ||
Former [2009/47] | IE | 11.03.2009 | |
LT | 11.03.2009 | ||
LV | 11.03.2009 | ||
NL | 11.03.2009 | ||
PL | 11.03.2009 | ||
SI | 11.03.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
ES | 22.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/46] | LT | 11.03.2009 | |
LV | 11.03.2009 | ||
NL | 11.03.2009 | ||
PL | 11.03.2009 | ||
SI | 11.03.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
ES | 22.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/41] | LT | 11.03.2009 | |
LV | 11.03.2009 | ||
NL | 11.03.2009 | ||
PL | 11.03.2009 | ||
SI | 11.03.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | LT | 11.03.2009 | |
NL | 11.03.2009 | ||
SI | 11.03.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]EP0527881 (VALMET-KARLSTAD AB) [DA] 1 * column 13, lines 11-38 ** figures 2,4b *; | [A]DE3317457 (VOITH GMBH J M [DE]) [A] 1 * page 12, paragraph 3 - page 13, paragraph 1 * * figure 2 * | by applicant | DE3317455 | EP0527881 | EP0527881 |