EP1603349 - Central multiple access control for frequency hopping radio networks [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.09.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 26.06.2013 [2013/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/44] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2005/49] | For all designated states TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Elg, Johannes Valborgsgatan 43 216 13 Malmö / SE | 02 /
Haartsen, Jaap Bruchterweg 81 7772 BG Hardenberg / NL | [2005/49] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/49] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05015321.2 | 12.01.1999 | [2005/49] | Priority number, date | US19980071262P | 13.01.1998 Original published format: US 71262 P | US19980210594 | 15.12.1998 Original published format: US 210594 | [2005/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1603349 | Date: | 07.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1603349 | Date: | 03.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04W74/06 | [2010/23] | CPC: |
H04W74/06 (EP,US);
H04B1/715 (KR);
H04B1/713 (EP,US);
H04W52/0216 (EP,US);
H04W68/00 (EP,US);
H04W8/26 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2005/49] | H04Q7/22 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2005/49] | Title | German: | Zentrale Vielfachzugriffssteuerung für Frequenzsprünge in Funknetzwerken | [2005/49] | English: | Central multiple access control for frequency hopping radio networks | [2005/49] | French: | Contrôle central à accès multiple pour des réseaux radio à sauts de fréquence | [2005/49] | Examination procedure | 14.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/49] | 24.03.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.06.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.09.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 17.09.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP99902946.5 / EP1048182 | Opposition(s) | 04.08.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 03.11.2010 | SE | 03.11.2010 | LU | 12.01.2011 | MC | 31.01.2011 | GR | 04.02.2011 | [2013/26] |
Former [2013/25] | SE | 03.11.2010 | |
LU | 12.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
GR | 04.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/42] | SE | 03.11.2010 | |
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
GR | 04.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/32] | SE | 03.11.2010 | |
GR | 04.02.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4680583 (GROVER WAYNE D [CA]) [A] 1,8,15,16 * column 1, line 7 - line 12 ** column 3, line 62 - column 4, line 33 *; | [XA]US5297144 (GILBERT SHELDON L [US], et al) [X] 1,8,15,16 * column 2, line 22 - line 68 * * column 6, line 5 - line 28 * * column 7, line 35 - line 62 * * figure 3 * [A] 2-7,9-14; | [A]US5577043 (GUO EILEEN J [US], et al) [A] 1,8,15,16 * column 1, line 23 - line 39 * * column 2, line 30 - line 46 * * column 3, line 39 - column 4, line 19 * * column 4, line 45 - line 59 * * figure 2 * |