EP1616823 - Stacking module of media dispenser and control method thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.03.2012 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 25.07.2012 [2012/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG N-Sys Inc. 5th Floor, LG Mapo Bldg. 275, Kongduk-dong Mapo-gu Seoul City, 121-721 / KR | [2011/17] |
Former [2006/03] | For all designated states LG N-Sys. Inc. 5th Floor, LG Mapo Bldg. 275, Kongduk-dong Mapo-gu Seoul City, 121-721 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ko, Kyung Ho 104-916, Auj 1-cha Apartment Jisan-dong Pyeongtaek City Gyeonggi-do 459-752 / KR | [2006/03] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/03] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05015376.6 | 14.07.2005 | [2006/03] | Priority number, date | KR20040055788 | 16.07.2004 Original published format: KR 2004055788 | [2006/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1616823 | Date: | 18.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1616823 | Date: | 06.02.2008 | [2008/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1616823 | Date: | 27.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B65H29/40, B65H31/06, B65H31/30 | [2006/03] | CPC: |
B65H29/40 (EP,US);
G07F19/00 (KR);
B65H31/06 (EP,US);
B65H31/3045 (EP,US);
B65H2301/42242 (EP,US);
B65H2402/10 (EP,US);
B65H2405/51 (EP,US);
B65H2405/52 (EP,US);
B65H2408/13 (EP,US);
B65H2701/1912 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT, NL, SE [2008/42] |
Former [2006/03] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Stapelmodul für Medienausgabegerät und Verfahren zu dessen Steuerung | [2006/03] | English: | Stacking module of media dispenser and control method thereof | [2006/03] | French: | Module d'empilage pour distributeur de média et méthode pour son contrôle | [2006/03] | Examination procedure | 12.08.2005 | Examination requested [2006/03] | 07.08.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 08.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.09.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, PL, PT, RO, SI, SK, TR | 15.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.01.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.03.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 14.03.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.01.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 27.04.2011 | NL | 27.04.2011 | SE | 27.04.2011 | GB | 27.07.2011 | [2012/30] |
Former [2012/23] | IT | 27.04.2011 | |
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
Former [2012/02] | NL | 27.04.2011 | |
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | SE | 27.04.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4150757 (LAYBOURN ROBERT J [US], et al) [A] 1,9* the whole document *; | [A]US2002180142 (SISK MARK [US]) [A] 1,9 * the whole document * | by applicant | US2002180142 |