EP1619516 - Method and device for the localisation of an object [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.01.2010 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: LI | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jurleit, André Lucas-Cranach-Strasse 57 97422 Schweinfurt / DE | [2006/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2006/04] | Representative(s) | Gosdin, Michael Adam-Stegerwald-Strasse 6 97422 Schweinfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/04] | Gosdin, Michael Graf-Berthold-Strasse 1 97422 Schweinfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 05015395.6 | 15.07.2005 | [2006/04] | Priority number, date | DE20041035330 | 21.07.2004 Original published format: DE102004035330 | [2006/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1619516 | Date: | 25.01.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1619516 | Date: | 25.02.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G01S1/00, // G08B21/02 | [2008/39] | CPC: |
H04W4/029 (EP,US);
G08B21/0269 (EP);
G08B21/0283 (EP);
H04W4/02 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2006/04] | G01S1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/04] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Orten eines Objekts | [2006/04] | English: | Method and device for the localisation of an object | [2006/04] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour localiser un objet | [2006/04] | Examination procedure | 17.07.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/36] | 12.09.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.01.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 02.01.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.11.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 25.02.2009 | CZ | 25.02.2009 | DK | 25.02.2009 | EE | 25.02.2009 | FI | 25.02.2009 | IE | 25.02.2009 | IT | 25.02.2009 | LT | 25.02.2009 | LV | 25.02.2009 | PL | 25.02.2009 | RO | 25.02.2009 | SI | 25.02.2009 | SK | 25.02.2009 | TR | 25.02.2009 | BG | 25.05.2009 | SE | 25.05.2009 | GR | 26.05.2009 | ES | 05.06.2009 | IS | 25.06.2009 | GB | 15.07.2009 | LU | 15.07.2009 | BE | 31.07.2009 | FR | 31.07.2009 | MC | 31.07.2009 | PT | 12.08.2009 | HU | 26.08.2009 | [2011/45] |
Former [2011/44] | CY | 25.02.2009 | |
CZ | 25.02.2009 | ||
DK | 25.02.2009 | ||
EE | 25.02.2009 | ||
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
IE | 25.02.2009 | ||
IT | 25.02.2009 | ||
LT | 25.02.2009 | ||
LV | 25.02.2009 | ||
PL | 25.02.2009 | ||
RO | 25.02.2009 | ||
SI | 25.02.2009 | ||
SK | 25.02.2009 | ||
TR | 25.02.2009 | ||
BG | 25.05.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
GR | 26.05.2009 | ||
ES | 05.06.2009 | ||
IS | 25.06.2009 | ||
GB | 15.07.2009 | ||
LU | 15.07.2009 | ||
BE | 31.07.2009 | ||
FR | 31.07.2009 | ||
LI | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
PT | 12.08.2009 | ||
HU | 26.08.2009 | ||
Former [2011/32] | CZ | 25.02.2009 | |
DK | 25.02.2009 | ||
EE | 25.02.2009 | ||
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
IE | 25.02.2009 | ||
IT | 25.02.2009 | ||
LT | 25.02.2009 | ||
LV | 25.02.2009 | ||
PL | 25.02.2009 | ||
RO | 25.02.2009 | ||
SI | 25.02.2009 | ||
SK | 25.02.2009 | ||
BG | 25.05.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
GR | 26.05.2009 | ||
ES | 05.06.2009 | ||
IS | 25.06.2009 | ||
GB | 15.07.2009 | ||
LU | 15.07.2009 | ||
BE | 31.07.2009 | ||
FR | 31.07.2009 | ||
LI | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
PT | 12.08.2009 | ||
HU | 26.08.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | CZ | 25.02.2009 | |
DK | 25.02.2009 | ||
EE | 25.02.2009 | ||
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
IE | 25.02.2009 | ||
IT | 25.02.2009 | ||
LT | 25.02.2009 | ||
LV | 25.02.2009 | ||
PL | 25.02.2009 | ||
RO | 25.02.2009 | ||
SI | 25.02.2009 | ||
SK | 25.02.2009 | ||
BG | 25.05.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
GR | 26.05.2009 | ||
ES | 05.06.2009 | ||
IS | 25.06.2009 | ||
GB | 15.07.2009 | ||
LU | 15.07.2009 | ||
BE | 31.07.2009 | ||
FR | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
PT | 12.08.2009 | ||
Former [2011/15] | CZ | 25.02.2009 | |
DK | 25.02.2009 | ||
EE | 25.02.2009 | ||
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
IE | 25.02.2009 | ||
IT | 25.02.2009 | ||
LT | 25.02.2009 | ||
LV | 25.02.2009 | ||
PL | 25.02.2009 | ||
RO | 25.02.2009 | ||
SI | 25.02.2009 | ||
SK | 25.02.2009 | ||
BG | 25.05.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
GR | 26.05.2009 | ||
ES | 05.06.2009 | ||
IS | 25.06.2009 | ||
GB | 15.07.2009 | ||
BE | 31.07.2009 | ||
FR | 31.07.2009 | ||
LI | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
PT | 12.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/51] | CZ | 25.02.2009 | |
DK | 25.02.2009 | ||
EE | 25.02.2009 | ||
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
IE | 25.02.2009 | ||
LT | 25.02.2009 | ||
LV | 25.02.2009 | ||
PL | 25.02.2009 | ||
RO | 25.02.2009 | ||
SI | 25.02.2009 | ||
SK | 25.02.2009 | ||
BG | 25.05.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
GR | 26.05.2009 | ||
ES | 05.06.2009 | ||
IS | 25.06.2009 | ||
GB | 15.07.2009 | ||
BE | 31.07.2009 | ||
FR | 31.07.2009 | ||
LI | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
PT | 12.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/39] | CZ | 25.02.2009 | |
DK | 25.02.2009 | ||
EE | 25.02.2009 | ||
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
IE | 25.02.2009 | ||
LT | 25.02.2009 | ||
LV | 25.02.2009 | ||
PL | 25.02.2009 | ||
RO | 25.02.2009 | ||
SI | 25.02.2009 | ||
SK | 25.02.2009 | ||
BG | 25.05.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
ES | 05.06.2009 | ||
IS | 25.06.2009 | ||
GB | 15.07.2009 | ||
BE | 31.07.2009 | ||
FR | 31.07.2009 | ||
LI | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
PT | 12.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/29] | CZ | 25.02.2009 | |
DK | 25.02.2009 | ||
EE | 25.02.2009 | ||
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
IE | 25.02.2009 | ||
LT | 25.02.2009 | ||
LV | 25.02.2009 | ||
PL | 25.02.2009 | ||
RO | 25.02.2009 | ||
SI | 25.02.2009 | ||
SK | 25.02.2009 | ||
BG | 25.05.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
ES | 05.06.2009 | ||
IS | 25.06.2009 | ||
GB | 15.07.2009 | ||
BE | 31.07.2009 | ||
CH | 31.07.2009 | ||
FR | 31.07.2009 | ||
LI | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
PT | 12.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/25] | CZ | 25.02.2009 | |
DK | 25.02.2009 | ||
EE | 25.02.2009 | ||
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
IE | 25.02.2009 | ||
LT | 25.02.2009 | ||
LV | 25.02.2009 | ||
PL | 25.02.2009 | ||
RO | 25.02.2009 | ||
SI | 25.02.2009 | ||
SK | 25.02.2009 | ||
BG | 25.05.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
ES | 05.06.2009 | ||
IS | 25.06.2009 | ||
GB | 15.07.2009 | ||
CH | 31.07.2009 | ||
FR | 31.07.2009 | ||
LI | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
PT | 12.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/23] | CZ | 25.02.2009 | |
DK | 25.02.2009 | ||
EE | 25.02.2009 | ||
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
IE | 25.02.2009 | ||
LT | 25.02.2009 | ||
LV | 25.02.2009 | ||
PL | 25.02.2009 | ||
RO | 25.02.2009 | ||
SI | 25.02.2009 | ||
SK | 25.02.2009 | ||
BG | 25.05.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
ES | 05.06.2009 | ||
IS | 25.06.2009 | ||
CH | 31.07.2009 | ||
FR | 31.07.2009 | ||
LI | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
PT | 12.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/11] | CZ | 25.02.2009 | |
DK | 25.02.2009 | ||
EE | 25.02.2009 | ||
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
IE | 25.02.2009 | ||
LT | 25.02.2009 | ||
LV | 25.02.2009 | ||
PL | 25.02.2009 | ||
RO | 25.02.2009 | ||
SI | 25.02.2009 | ||
SK | 25.02.2009 | ||
BG | 25.05.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
ES | 05.06.2009 | ||
IS | 25.06.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
PT | 12.08.2009 | ||
Former [2009/51] | CZ | 25.02.2009 | |
DK | 25.02.2009 | ||
EE | 25.02.2009 | ||
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
IE | 25.02.2009 | ||
LT | 25.02.2009 | ||
LV | 25.02.2009 | ||
PL | 25.02.2009 | ||
RO | 25.02.2009 | ||
SI | 25.02.2009 | ||
SK | 25.02.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
ES | 05.06.2009 | ||
IS | 25.06.2009 | ||
PT | 12.08.2009 | ||
Former [2009/47] | DK | 25.02.2009 | |
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
IE | 25.02.2009 | ||
LT | 25.02.2009 | ||
LV | 25.02.2009 | ||
PL | 25.02.2009 | ||
SI | 25.02.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
ES | 05.06.2009 | ||
IS | 25.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/46] | DK | 25.02.2009 | |
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
LT | 25.02.2009 | ||
LV | 25.02.2009 | ||
PL | 25.02.2009 | ||
SI | 25.02.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
ES | 05.06.2009 | ||
IS | 25.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/41] | FI | 25.02.2009 | |
LT | 25.02.2009 | ||
LV | 25.02.2009 | ||
PL | 25.02.2009 | ||
SI | 25.02.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
IS | 25.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | FI | 25.02.2009 | |
LT | 25.02.2009 | ||
SI | 25.02.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5652570 (LEPKOFKER ROBERT [US]) [Y] 13* column 4, lines 6-36 *; | [XY]EP1333692 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1-12 * figures 1-3 * * column 1, paragraphs 3,5 * * column 2, paragraph 7 * * column 3, paragraph 16 * * column 6, paragraph 30 * [Y] 13 | by applicant | US6222483 |