EP1621743 - Inlet housing for axial turbomachines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.01.2009 Database last updated on 26.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 22.12.2010 [2010/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAN Turbo AG Steinbrinkstrasse 1 46145 Oberhausen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/05] | For all designated states MAN TURBO AG Steinbrinkstrasse 1 46145 Oberhausen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wiedermann, Alexander, Dr. Zur langen Brücke 42 46569 Hünxe / DE | 02 /
Böhle, Martin, Prof. Dr. Gaussstrasse 20 42097 Wuppertal / DE | [2006/05] | Representative(s) | Radünz, Ingo Schumannstrasse 100 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | [2006/05] | Application number, filing date | 05015519.1 | 18.07.2005 | [2006/05] | Priority number, date | DE20041036331 | 27.07.2004 Original published format: DE102004036331 | [2006/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1621743 | Date: | 01.02.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1621743 | Date: | 19.03.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F02C7/04, F04D29/42 | [2006/05] | CPC: |
F02C7/04 (EP,US);
F05D2240/12 (EP,US);
F05D2240/126 (EP,US);
F05D2250/14 (EP,US);
F05D2250/141 (EP,US);
F05D2250/33 (EP,US);
F05D2250/34 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/05] | Title | German: | Einströmgehäuse für axiale Strömungsmaschinen | [2006/05] | English: | Inlet housing for axial turbomachines | [2006/05] | French: | Carter d'admission pour turbomachines | [2006/05] | Examination procedure | 04.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/05] | 24.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.12.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 20.12.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.12.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 19.03.2008 | CZ | 19.03.2008 | DK | 19.03.2008 | EE | 19.03.2008 | FI | 19.03.2008 | IE | 19.03.2008 | LT | 19.03.2008 | LV | 19.03.2008 | PL | 19.03.2008 | RO | 19.03.2008 | SI | 19.03.2008 | SK | 19.03.2008 | TR | 19.03.2008 | BG | 19.06.2008 | GR | 20.06.2008 | ES | 30.06.2008 | AT | 18.07.2008 | LU | 18.07.2008 | IS | 19.07.2008 | BE | 31.07.2008 | MC | 31.07.2008 | PT | 26.08.2008 | HU | 20.09.2008 | [2010/51] |
Former [2010/38] | CY | 19.03.2008 | |
CZ | 19.03.2008 | ||
DK | 19.03.2008 | ||
EE | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
IE | 19.03.2008 | ||
LT | 19.03.2008 | ||
LV | 19.03.2008 | ||
PL | 19.03.2008 | ||
RO | 19.03.2008 | ||
SI | 19.03.2008 | ||
SK | 19.03.2008 | ||
TR | 19.03.2008 | ||
BG | 19.06.2008 | ||
ES | 30.06.2008 | ||
AT | 18.07.2008 | ||
LU | 18.07.2008 | ||
IS | 19.07.2008 | ||
BE | 31.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
PT | 26.08.2008 | ||
HU | 20.09.2008 | ||
Former [2010/36] | CY | 19.03.2008 | |
CZ | 19.03.2008 | ||
DK | 19.03.2008 | ||
EE | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
IE | 19.03.2008 | ||
LT | 19.03.2008 | ||
LV | 19.03.2008 | ||
PL | 19.03.2008 | ||
RO | 19.03.2008 | ||
SI | 19.03.2008 | ||
SK | 19.03.2008 | ||
BG | 19.06.2008 | ||
ES | 30.06.2008 | ||
AT | 18.07.2008 | ||
LU | 18.07.2008 | ||
IS | 19.07.2008 | ||
BE | 31.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
PT | 26.08.2008 | ||
HU | 20.09.2008 | ||
Former [2010/33] | CY | 19.03.2008 | |
CZ | 19.03.2008 | ||
DK | 19.03.2008 | ||
EE | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
IE | 19.03.2008 | ||
LT | 19.03.2008 | ||
LV | 19.03.2008 | ||
PL | 19.03.2008 | ||
RO | 19.03.2008 | ||
SI | 19.03.2008 | ||
SK | 19.03.2008 | ||
BG | 19.06.2008 | ||
ES | 30.06.2008 | ||
AT | 18.07.2008 | ||
LU | 18.07.2008 | ||
IS | 19.07.2008 | ||
BE | 31.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
PT | 26.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/51] | CY | 19.03.2008 | |
CZ | 19.03.2008 | ||
DK | 19.03.2008 | ||
EE | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
IE | 19.03.2008 | ||
LT | 19.03.2008 | ||
LV | 19.03.2008 | ||
PL | 19.03.2008 | ||
RO | 19.03.2008 | ||
SI | 19.03.2008 | ||
SK | 19.03.2008 | ||
BG | 19.06.2008 | ||
ES | 30.06.2008 | ||
AT | 18.07.2008 | ||
IS | 19.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
PT | 26.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/45] | CY | 19.03.2008 | |
CZ | 19.03.2008 | ||
DK | 19.03.2008 | ||
EE | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
IE | 19.03.2008 | ||
LT | 19.03.2008 | ||
LV | 19.03.2008 | ||
PL | 19.03.2008 | ||
RO | 19.03.2008 | ||
SI | 19.03.2008 | ||
SK | 19.03.2008 | ||
BG | 19.06.2008 | ||
ES | 30.06.2008 | ||
IS | 19.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
PT | 26.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/24] | CZ | 19.03.2008 | |
DK | 19.03.2008 | ||
EE | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
IE | 19.03.2008 | ||
LT | 19.03.2008 | ||
LV | 19.03.2008 | ||
PL | 19.03.2008 | ||
RO | 19.03.2008 | ||
SI | 19.03.2008 | ||
SK | 19.03.2008 | ||
BG | 19.06.2008 | ||
ES | 30.06.2008 | ||
IS | 19.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
PT | 26.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | CZ | 19.03.2008 | |
DK | 19.03.2008 | ||
EE | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
IE | 19.03.2008 | ||
LT | 19.03.2008 | ||
LV | 19.03.2008 | ||
PL | 19.03.2008 | ||
RO | 19.03.2008 | ||
SI | 19.03.2008 | ||
SK | 19.03.2008 | ||
ES | 30.06.2008 | ||
IS | 19.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
PT | 26.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/18] | CZ | 19.03.2008 | |
DK | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
IE | 19.03.2008 | ||
LT | 19.03.2008 | ||
LV | 19.03.2008 | ||
PL | 19.03.2008 | ||
RO | 19.03.2008 | ||
SI | 19.03.2008 | ||
SK | 19.03.2008 | ||
ES | 30.06.2008 | ||
IS | 19.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
PT | 26.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | CZ | 19.03.2008 | |
DK | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
IE | 19.03.2008 | ||
LT | 19.03.2008 | ||
LV | 19.03.2008 | ||
PL | 19.03.2008 | ||
RO | 19.03.2008 | ||
SI | 19.03.2008 | ||
SK | 19.03.2008 | ||
ES | 30.06.2008 | ||
IS | 19.07.2008 | ||
PT | 26.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/05] | CZ | 19.03.2008 | |
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
LT | 19.03.2008 | ||
LV | 19.03.2008 | ||
PL | 19.03.2008 | ||
RO | 19.03.2008 | ||
SI | 19.03.2008 | ||
SK | 19.03.2008 | ||
ES | 30.06.2008 | ||
IS | 19.07.2008 | ||
PT | 26.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | CZ | 19.03.2008 | |
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
LT | 19.03.2008 | ||
LV | 19.03.2008 | ||
PL | 19.03.2008 | ||
RO | 19.03.2008 | ||
SI | 19.03.2008 | ||
SK | 19.03.2008 | ||
ES | 30.06.2008 | ||
PT | 26.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | FI | 19.03.2008 | |
LT | 19.03.2008 | ||
LV | 19.03.2008 | ||
PL | 19.03.2008 | ||
SI | 19.03.2008 | ||
ES | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | FI | 19.03.2008 | |
LT | 19.03.2008 | ||
LV | 19.03.2008 | ||
PL | 19.03.2008 | ||
SI | 19.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/43] | FI | 19.03.2008 | |
LT | 19.03.2008 | ||
PL | 19.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | FI | 19.03.2008 | |
LT | 19.03.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB805003 (W H ALLEN SONS & COMPANY LTD, et al) [X] 1-4 * page 1, line 13 - line 57 * * page 2, line 66 - line 123 * * figure - *; | [A]SU1430609 (SAVINOV ALEKSANDR V [SU]) [A] 1-4 * figure - *; | [X]EP0385294 (KLOECKNER HUMBOLDT DEUTZ AG [DE]) [X] 1-4 * column 1, line 8 - line 54 * * column 2, line 28 - column 3, line 44 * * abstract *; | [A]US5257906 (GRAY LEWIS [US], et al) [A] 1-4 * column 3, line 27 - column 4, line 7 * * column 6, line 16 - line 32 * * abstract *; | [A]DE4426522 (MAN B & W DIESEL AG [DE]) [A] 1-4 * column 1, line 42 - line 51 * * column 2, line 37 - column 3, line 61 * * abstract *; | [A]EP0959231 (ASEA BROWN BOVERI [CH]) [A] 1-4 * paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0019] ** figure - * | [A] - SAVINOV A V, "Axial turbomachine input device", DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, Database accession no. 1989-121095 [A] 1-4 * column A * |