13.12.2013 |
Withdrawal of application |
published on 15.01.2014 [2014/03] |
26.11.2013 |
New entry: Decision (+date) in appeal procedure |
|
20.11.2013 |
Deletion: Date of oral proceedings |
|
20.09.2013 |
Change: Date of oral proceedings |
|
20.09.2013 |
Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
12.07.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.07.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.02.2012 |
New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused |
|
15.07.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.05.2011 |
Change - applicant |
published on 22.06.2011 [2011/25] |
08.04.2011 |
Change - representative |
published on 11.05.2011 [2011/19] |
28.01.2011 |
Change - applicant |
published on 02.03.2011 [2011/09] |
21.12.2010 |
Change: Appeal number |
|
09.11.2010 |
New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of appeal |
|
10.09.2010 |
New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal |
|
10.09.2010 |
New entry: Appeal number |
|
17.07.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.07.2010 |
New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
23.12.2009 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
18.07.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.08.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.12.2007 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
30.10.2007 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
03.08.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.06.2007 |
New entry: Loss of particular rights: legal effect |
|
15.06.2007 |
First examination report |
|
12.06.2007 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
06.03.2007 |
New entry: Loss of particular rights: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
22.12.2006 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 24.01.2007 [2007/04] |
20.12.2006 |
New entry: Period of grace R.85a / R.108(3) EPC1973: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
20.10.2006 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 22.11.2006 [2006/47] |
18.10.2006 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
31.03.2006 |
Publication of search report |
published on 17.05.2006 [2006/20] |
31.03.2006 |
Change - classification |
published on 17.05.2006 [2006/20] |
09.12.2005 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 25.01.2006 [2006/04] |