EP1619655 - Liquid crystal display device with coloured back light sources and white balance correction [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.12.2013 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.12.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 15.01.2014 [2014/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Onanovich Group AG, LLC 2711 Centerville Road, Suite 400 Dept. 307 Wilmington, DE 19808 / US | [2011/25] |
Former [2011/09] | For all designated states S. SONDER ET CIE, S.A. 62 Eaton Place London SW1X 8AT / GB | ||
Former [2006/04] | For all designated states ALPS ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 1-7 Yukigaya, Otsuka-cho, Ota-ku Tokyo 145-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Oizumi, Mitsuo c/o ALPS ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 1-7, Yukigaya, Otsuka-cho Ota-ku / JP | 02 /
Hayashi, Yuzo c/o ALPS ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 1-7, Yukigaya, Otsuka-cho Ota-ku / JP | [2006/04] | Representative(s) | Kazi, Ilya, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/19] | Kazi, Ilya, et al Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | ||
Former [2006/04] | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05015545.6 | 18.07.2005 | [2006/04] | Priority number, date | JP20040211708 | 20.07.2004 Original published format: JP 2004211708 | [2006/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1619655 | Date: | 25.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1619655 | Date: | 17.05.2006 | [2006/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/34, G09G3/36 | [2006/20] | CPC: |
G09G3/3413 (EP,US);
G02F1/133 (KR);
G09G2310/0235 (EP,US);
G09G2320/0285 (EP,US);
G09G2320/0646 (EP,US);
G09G2320/0666 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/04] | G09G3/34 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/04] |
Former [2006/04] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Flüssigkristallanzeigeeinrichtung mit farbigen Hintergrund-Lichtquellen und Korrektur des Weissabgleichs | [2006/04] | English: | Liquid crystal display device with coloured back light sources and white balance correction | [2006/04] | French: | Dispositif d' affichage à cristaux liquides avec sources d'éclairage colorées par l'arrière et correction de l'équilibre du blanc | [2006/04] | Examination procedure | 09.10.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.10.2006 | Examination requested [2006/47] | 18.11.2006 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 08.03.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 14.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 08.07.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 08.07.2010 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 20.11.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/03] | Appeal following examination | 06.09.2010 | Appeal received No. T2469/10 | 03.11.2010 | Statement of grounds filed | 20.11.2013 | Result of appeal procedure: the application was withdrawn | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.06.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 06.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 22.12.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 22.12.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 22.12.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 22.12.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 22.12.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 22.12.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 22.12.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 22.12.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 22.12.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 22.12.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 22.12.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 22.12.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 22.12.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 22.12.2006 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 22.12.2006 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 22.12.2006 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 22.12.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 22.12.2006 | LV   M01   Not yet paid | 22.12.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 22.12.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 22.12.2006 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 22.12.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 22.12.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 22.12.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 22.12.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 22.12.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 22.12.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US6373497 (MCKNIGHT DOUGLAS J [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,8 * column 3, line 16 - column 6, line 57; figure 2 * [Y] 3,6,7; | [Y]US2002070911 (KOMA NORIO [JP]) [Y] 4,8 * paragraphs [0052] - [0055]; figure 4 *; | [Y]US2002140880 (WEINDORF PAUL F L [US], et al) [Y] 3,6,7 * paragraphs [0052] - [0055]; figure 4 *; | [XY]US6624756 (BUTTERWORTH MARK M [US]) [X] 1-3,5-7 * column 8 - column 10; figure 10 * * column 6, line 4 - line 31 * [Y] 4,8; | [XY]US6633301 (DALLAS JAMES M [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-7 * column 5, line 1 - column 7, line 18; figures 3,5 * * column 1, line 6 - line 26 * * column 8, line 8 - line 14 * [Y] 4,8; | [XY]US2004036672 (YOO JANG-JIN [KR], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,8 * paragraphs [0043] - [0058]; figures 5,7 * [Y] 3,6,7; | [Y] - INTERNATIONAL BUSINESS MACHINES CORPORATION, "Stepwise voltage compensated driving for a vertical aligned LCD", RESEARCH DISCLOSURE, MASON PUBLICATIONS, HAMPSHIRE, GB, (200003), vol. 431, no. 106, ISSN 0374-4353, XP007125767 [Y] 4,8 * the whole document * | [A] - WU SHIN-TSON ET AL, "Chiral-homeotropic liquid crystal cells for high contrast and low voltage displays", JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS. NEW YORK, US, (19971115), vol. 82, no. 10, ISSN 0021-8979, pages 4795 - 4799, XP012042802 [A] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.366337 | Examination | US2002084973 | US2003122754 |