EP1746433 - Method and apparatus for finding avalanche victims [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.07.2008 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 23.12.2009 [2009/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kampel, Gerald Hainbuchenstrasse 67 82024 Taufkirchen / DE | [2007/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kampel, Gerald Hainbuchenstrasse 67 82024 Taufkirchen / DE | [2007/04] | Representative(s) | Bohnenberger, Johannes, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/52] | Bohnenberger, Johannes, et al Meissner, Bolt & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/04] | Bohnenberger, Johannes, et al P.O. Box 860624 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05015558.9 | 18.07.2005 | [2007/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1746433 | Date: | 24.01.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1746433 | Date: | 29.08.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.01.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G01S1/04, A63B29/02 | [2007/04] | CPC: |
A63B29/021 (EP,US);
G01S1/047 (EP,US);
G01S1/045 (EP,US);
G01S1/68 (EP,US);
G01S11/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI [2007/35] |
Former [2007/04] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Auffinden eines Verschütteten | [2007/04] | English: | Method and apparatus for finding avalanche victims | [2007/04] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour la détection de personnes enseveliés | [2007/04] | Examination procedure | 01.02.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.02.2006 | Examination requested [2007/04] | 12.05.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.09.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 06.09.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.05.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE3531726 (KAMPEL GERALD, et al) [AD] 1,17 * abstract * * column 3, line 6 - line 26 * * column 6, line 2 - line 38 *; | [A]US5955982 (MOULIN JEAN MARC [FR]) [A] 1,17 * abstract ** column 4, line 36 - column 5, line 65 *; | [A]US6246863 (KAMPEL GERALD [DE]) [A] 1,17 * abstract * * column 16, line 49 - line 67 * * column 17, line 22 - line 32 * * column 18, line 62 - column 19, line 19 * | by applicant | DE3531726 |