EP1619001 - Power tool with remote stop [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.01.2011 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Black & Decker Inc. 1207 Drummond Plaza Newark, Delaware 19711 / US | [2006/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Garcia, Jaime E. 143 Brookstone Place Jackson, Tennessee 38305 / US | 02 /
Weston, Jeffrey D. 529 Gettysburg Drive Jackson, Tennessee 38305 / US | [2006/04] | Representative(s) | Bell, Ian Stephen, et al Black & Decker Patent Department 210 Bath Road Slough Berkshire SL1 3YD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/29] | Bell, Ian Stephen, et al Black & Decker Patent Department 210 Bath Road Slough Berkshire SL1 3YD / GB | ||
Former [2006/04] | Bell, Ian Stephen, et al Black & Decker, 210 Bath Road Slough Berks SL1 3YD / GB | Application number, filing date | 05015580.3 | 19.07.2005 | [2006/04] | Priority number, date | US20040898157 | 23.07.2004 Original published format: US 898157 | [2006/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1619001 | Date: | 25.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1619001 | Date: | 24.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B25F5/00 | [2006/04] | CPC: |
G05B9/02 (EP,US);
B23D59/001 (EP,US);
B23Q11/0092 (EP,US);
B25F5/00 (EP,US);
G08C17/02 (EP,US);
G08C23/04 (EP,US);
Y10S388/937 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/04] | Title | German: | Werkzeugmaschine mit fernbedientem Anhalten | [2006/04] | English: | Power tool with remote stop | [2006/04] | French: | Outil motorisé avec dispositif d'arrêt à distance | [2006/04] | Examination procedure | 27.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/36] | 21.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.02.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 09.02.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.12.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 27.07.2006 | M01   Fee paid on   27.07.2006 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.03.2010 | CY | 24.03.2010 | CZ | 24.03.2010 | EE | 24.03.2010 | FI | 24.03.2010 | LT | 24.03.2010 | LV | 24.03.2010 | NL | 24.03.2010 | PL | 24.03.2010 | RO | 24.03.2010 | SI | 24.03.2010 | SK | 24.03.2010 | TR | 24.03.2010 | BG | 24.06.2010 | GR | 25.06.2010 | ES | 05.07.2010 | IE | 19.07.2010 | LU | 19.07.2010 | IS | 24.07.2010 | PT | 26.07.2010 | CH | 31.07.2010 | LI | 31.07.2010 | MC | 31.07.2010 | FR | 02.08.2010 | HU | 25.09.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/44] | AT | 24.03.2010 | |
CY | 24.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 24.03.2010 | ||
EE | 24.03.2010 | ||
FI | 24.03.2010 | ||
LT | 24.03.2010 | ||
LV | 24.03.2010 | ||
NL | 24.03.2010 | ||
PL | 24.03.2010 | ||
RO | 24.03.2010 | ||
SI | 24.03.2010 | ||
SK | 24.03.2010 | ||
BG | 24.06.2010 | ||
GR | 25.06.2010 | ||
ES | 05.07.2010 | ||
IE | 19.07.2010 | ||
LU | 19.07.2010 | ||
IS | 24.07.2010 | ||
PT | 26.07.2010 | ||
CH | 31.07.2010 | ||
LI | 31.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
FR | 02.08.2010 | ||
HU | 25.09.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 24.03.2010 | |
CY | 24.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 24.03.2010 | ||
EE | 24.03.2010 | ||
FI | 24.03.2010 | ||
LT | 24.03.2010 | ||
LV | 24.03.2010 | ||
NL | 24.03.2010 | ||
PL | 24.03.2010 | ||
RO | 24.03.2010 | ||
SI | 24.03.2010 | ||
SK | 24.03.2010 | ||
BG | 24.06.2010 | ||
GR | 25.06.2010 | ||
ES | 05.07.2010 | ||
IE | 19.07.2010 | ||
IS | 24.07.2010 | ||
PT | 26.07.2010 | ||
CH | 31.07.2010 | ||
LI | 31.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
FR | 02.08.2010 | ||
HU | 25.09.2010 | ||
Former [2012/37] | AT | 24.03.2010 | |
CY | 24.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 24.03.2010 | ||
EE | 24.03.2010 | ||
FI | 24.03.2010 | ||
LT | 24.03.2010 | ||
LV | 24.03.2010 | ||
NL | 24.03.2010 | ||
PL | 24.03.2010 | ||
RO | 24.03.2010 | ||
SI | 24.03.2010 | ||
SK | 24.03.2010 | ||
BG | 24.06.2010 | ||
GR | 25.06.2010 | ||
ES | 05.07.2010 | ||
IE | 19.07.2010 | ||
IS | 24.07.2010 | ||
PT | 26.07.2010 | ||
CH | 31.07.2010 | ||
LI | 31.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
FR | 02.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/36] | AT | 24.03.2010 | |
CZ | 24.03.2010 | ||
EE | 24.03.2010 | ||
FI | 24.03.2010 | ||
LT | 24.03.2010 | ||
LV | 24.03.2010 | ||
NL | 24.03.2010 | ||
PL | 24.03.2010 | ||
RO | 24.03.2010 | ||
SI | 24.03.2010 | ||
SK | 24.03.2010 | ||
BG | 24.06.2010 | ||
GR | 25.06.2010 | ||
ES | 05.07.2010 | ||
IE | 19.07.2010 | ||
IS | 24.07.2010 | ||
PT | 26.07.2010 | ||
CH | 31.07.2010 | ||
LI | 31.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
FR | 02.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/32] | AT | 24.03.2010 | |
CZ | 24.03.2010 | ||
EE | 24.03.2010 | ||
FI | 24.03.2010 | ||
LT | 24.03.2010 | ||
LV | 24.03.2010 | ||
NL | 24.03.2010 | ||
PL | 24.03.2010 | ||
RO | 24.03.2010 | ||
SI | 24.03.2010 | ||
SK | 24.03.2010 | ||
BG | 24.06.2010 | ||
GR | 25.06.2010 | ||
ES | 05.07.2010 | ||
IS | 24.07.2010 | ||
PT | 26.07.2010 | ||
CH | 31.07.2010 | ||
LI | 31.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
FR | 02.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/20] | AT | 24.03.2010 | |
CZ | 24.03.2010 | ||
EE | 24.03.2010 | ||
FI | 24.03.2010 | ||
LT | 24.03.2010 | ||
LV | 24.03.2010 | ||
NL | 24.03.2010 | ||
PL | 24.03.2010 | ||
RO | 24.03.2010 | ||
SI | 24.03.2010 | ||
SK | 24.03.2010 | ||
BG | 24.06.2010 | ||
GR | 25.06.2010 | ||
ES | 05.07.2010 | ||
IS | 24.07.2010 | ||
PT | 26.07.2010 | ||
CH | 31.07.2010 | ||
LI | 31.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/11] | AT | 24.03.2010 | |
CZ | 24.03.2010 | ||
EE | 24.03.2010 | ||
FI | 24.03.2010 | ||
LT | 24.03.2010 | ||
LV | 24.03.2010 | ||
NL | 24.03.2010 | ||
PL | 24.03.2010 | ||
RO | 24.03.2010 | ||
SI | 24.03.2010 | ||
SK | 24.03.2010 | ||
BG | 24.06.2010 | ||
GR | 25.06.2010 | ||
ES | 05.07.2010 | ||
IS | 24.07.2010 | ||
PT | 26.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | AT | 24.03.2010 | |
CZ | 24.03.2010 | ||
EE | 24.03.2010 | ||
FI | 24.03.2010 | ||
LT | 24.03.2010 | ||
LV | 24.03.2010 | ||
NL | 24.03.2010 | ||
PL | 24.03.2010 | ||
RO | 24.03.2010 | ||
SI | 24.03.2010 | ||
SK | 24.03.2010 | ||
BG | 24.06.2010 | ||
GR | 25.06.2010 | ||
ES | 05.07.2010 | ||
IS | 24.07.2010 | ||
PT | 26.07.2010 | ||
Former [2010/51] | AT | 24.03.2010 | |
CZ | 24.03.2010 | ||
EE | 24.03.2010 | ||
FI | 24.03.2010 | ||
LT | 24.03.2010 | ||
LV | 24.03.2010 | ||
NL | 24.03.2010 | ||
PL | 24.03.2010 | ||
RO | 24.03.2010 | ||
SI | 24.03.2010 | ||
SK | 24.03.2010 | ||
BG | 24.06.2010 | ||
GR | 25.06.2010 | ||
ES | 05.07.2010 | ||
IS | 24.07.2010 | ||
Former [2010/46] | AT | 24.03.2010 | |
FI | 24.03.2010 | ||
LT | 24.03.2010 | ||
LV | 24.03.2010 | ||
NL | 24.03.2010 | ||
PL | 24.03.2010 | ||
SI | 24.03.2010 | ||
GR | 25.06.2010 | ||
ES | 05.07.2010 | ||
Former [2010/45] | AT | 24.03.2010 | |
FI | 24.03.2010 | ||
LT | 24.03.2010 | ||
LV | 24.03.2010 | ||
NL | 24.03.2010 | ||
PL | 24.03.2010 | ||
SI | 24.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/39] | AT | 24.03.2010 | |
FI | 24.03.2010 | ||
LT | 24.03.2010 | ||
LV | 24.03.2010 | ||
PL | 24.03.2010 | ||
SI | 24.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/38] | AT | 24.03.2010 | |
FI | 24.03.2010 | ||
LT | 24.03.2010 | ||
PL | 24.03.2010 | ||
SI | 24.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/36] | LT | 24.03.2010 | |
PL | 24.03.2010 | ||
SI | 24.03.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JPS63245349 ; | [Y]US4351209 (ALFORD STEVEN D) [Y] 4,5,11,12,14,15,17-20,24 * figure 1 *; | [A]DE19902130 (KWANG JU ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1,11,21,22 * figure 4 *; | [Y]EP1077301 (MOTOROLA SEMICONDUCTEURS [FR]) [Y] 3,13 * figure 2 *; | [A]DE10029138 (HILTI AG [LI]) [A] 3,13 * the whole document *; | [A]US2002190947 (FEINSTEIN DAVID Y [US]) [A] 6,16* paragraph [0087]; figure 14 *; | [A]DE10216206 (METABOWERKE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,8,11,18,21,22 * column 3, line 40 - line 46; claim 3 *; | [A]EP1391263 (HITACHI KOKI KK [JP]) [A] 1,10,11,20-22 * figures 1,6 *; | [XY]US2004108120 (WIESNER BERND [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,7-10,21-23 * the whole document * [Y] 3-5,11-15,17-20,24 | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890126), vol. 013, no. 036, Database accession no. (M - 790), & JP63245349 A 19881012 (SHINYA ISHIZAKA) [X] 1,8,10,21,22 * abstract * [Y] 4,5,11,14,15,18,20,24 |