EP1624006 - Low viscosity polymer polyols [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 24.10.2008 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.10.2008 | Withdrawal of application | published on 26.11.2008 [2008/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer MaterialScience LLC 100 Bayer Road Pittsburgh, PA 15205 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/06] | For all designated states Bayer MaterialScience LLC 100 Bayer Road Pittsburgh PA 15205 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Adkins, Rick L. 100 Gladewood Lane Hurricane WV 25526 / US | 02 /
Guelcher, Scott A. 3524 Williams Drive Weirton WV 26062 / US | 03 /
Charron, James R. 644 Beverly Road Pittsburgh PA 15243 / US | 04 /
Hayes, John E. 5010 West Grove Lane Gibsonia PA 15044 / US | [2006/06] | Representative(s) | Weismantel, Lothar Bayer MaterialScience AG Law & Patents Patents and Licensing 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/06] | Weismantel, Lothar Bayer MaterialScience AG, Law & Patents Patents and Licensing 51368 Leverkusen / DE | Application number, filing date | 05015716.3 | 20.07.2005 | [2006/06] | Priority number, date | US20040909492 | 02.08.2004 Original published format: US 909492 | [2006/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1624006 | Date: | 08.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/63, C08F283/06, C08F290/06 | [2006/06] | CPC: |
C08G18/4883 (EP,US);
C08G18/28 (KR);
C08F283/06 (EP,US);
C08F290/062 (EP,US);
C08G18/632 (EP,US);
C08G18/636 (EP,US);
C08G18/8108 (EP,US);
C08G65/00 (KR);
C08J3/20 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/06] | Title | German: | Polymer Polyole mit niedriger Viskosität | [2006/06] | English: | Low viscosity polymer polyols | [2006/06] | French: | Polyols polymères à faible viscosité | [2006/06] | Examination procedure | 08.08.2006 | Examination requested [2006/38] | 18.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.07.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.10.2008 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2008/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DX]US4652589 (SIMROTH DONALD W [US], et al) [DX] 1-9,23,24 * column 6, lines 42-49 * * column 16, line 58 - column 18, line 12; examples 2,4,16,18 * * claims 57-69 *; | [DX]US5196476 (SIMROTH DONALD W [US]) [DX] 1-9,12-20,23,24 * column 14, line 51 - column 15, line 6 * * column 16, lines 15-48 * * column 17, lines 31-62; examples 3-10 * * claims 1,9,17,35,36,41,42 *; | [A]WO0000531 (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US], et al) [A] 1-24* page 9, lines 21-24; table 1 *; | [X]WO03097710 (BASF CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-9,12-20 * page 6, line 27 - page 7, line 17 * * page 7, lines 29-35 * * page 10, line 1 - page 11, line 8; claims 1,6-16,20,30,31,36 * |