EP1746530 - Apparatus for the identification of tools [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.10.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.05.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 09.06.2010 [2010/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Homag Holzbearbeitungssysteme AG Homagstrasse 3-5 72296 Schopfloch / DE | [2007/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gauss, Achim Forststrasse 15 72280 Dornstetten/Hallwangen / DE | 02 /
Sturm, Gotthilf Rinkwasen 7 72293 Glatten / DE | 03 /
Schneider, Franz Bachstrasse 7 78667 Villingendorf / DE | [2007/04] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/04] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05015802.1 | 20.07.2005 | [2007/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1746530 | Date: | 24.01.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1746530 | Date: | 03.12.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G06K19/077, B23Q3/00 | [2007/04] | CPC: |
G06K19/07758 (EP,US);
B23B31/02 (EP,US);
G06K19/07749 (EP);
B23B2231/10 (US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, IT, PL [2007/39] |
Former [2007/04] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Werkzeug- und Aggregatidentifikation | [2007/04] | English: | Apparatus for the identification of tools | [2007/04] | French: | Dispositif pour l'identification des outils | [2007/04] | Examination procedure | 19.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/35] | 25.07.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 23.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.10.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 20.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.10.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 21.10.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.09.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 31.07.2009 | [2010/23] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0230642 (GTE VALERON CORP [US]) [A] 8,9* the whole document *; | [Y]US2002158120 (ZIEROLF JOSEPH A [US]) [Y] 3-5 * paragraphs [0023] - [0027]; figure 1 *; | [XY]EP1339014 (BIG DAISHOWA SEIKI CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,6-9 * paragraphs [0017] - [0030]; figures 1-3 * [Y] 3-5 |