EP1619897 - Camera link system, camera device and camera link control method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.01.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 19.11.2008 [2008/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [2008/47] |
Former [2006/04] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kogane, Haruo 1-17-1, Ikuta Tama-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 214-0038 / JP | 02 /
Nakamura, Yasuji 5-37-6-201, Katakura Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 221-0865 / JP | 03 /
Ogata, Tsuyoshi 1-13-19-202, Kikuna Kouhoku-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 222-0011 / JP | 04 /
Maekawa, Koji 2-19-3-202, Fujiduka Kouhoku-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 222-0012 / JP | [2006/04] | Representative(s) | Balsters, Robert, et al Novagraaf International S.A. Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2006/04] | Balsters, Robert, et al Novagraaf International S.A. 25, avenue du Pailly 1220 Les Avanchets - Geneva / CH | Application number, filing date | 05015841.9 | 21.07.2005 | [2006/04] | Priority number, date | JP20040214426 | 22.07.2004 Original published format: JP 2004214426 | [2006/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1619897 | Date: | 25.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1619897 | Date: | 07.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/18, H04N5/232 | [2006/04] | CPC: |
G08B13/19693 (EP,US);
G08B13/1963 (EP,US);
G08B13/19643 (EP,US);
H04N7/181 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2006/39] |
Former [2006/04] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Kameraverbundsystem, Kameravorrichtung und Steuerverfahren für den Kameraverbund | [2006/04] | English: | Camera link system, camera device and camera link control method | [2006/04] | French: | Système d'appareil-photo en ligne, dispositif d'appareil-photo et méthode de contrôle d'appareil-photo en ligne | [2006/04] | Examination procedure | 17.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/20] | 13.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.01.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 19.01.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.12.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/07] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 07.03.2007 | ES | 18.06.2007 | [2008/23] |
Former [2007/44] | ES | 18.06.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0529317 (SENSORMATIC ELECTRONICS CORP [US]) [X] 1-7 * column 3, line 49 - column 6, line 58; figures 1-6 *; | [A]US2002052708 (POLLARD STEPHEN B [GB], et al) [A] 3,4 * page 4, paragraph 60 - page 5, paragraph 69; figure 6 *; | [X]US2002118969 (KANADE TAKEO [US], et al) [X] 1-7 * page 2, paragraph 22 - page 3, paragraph 34; figures 1-5 *; | [A]US2002135682 (OKA HIROTO [JP], et al) [A] 3,4 * abstract ** page 2, paragraph 26 *; | [X]US2003210329 (AAGAARD KENNETH JOSEPH [US], et al) [X] 1-7 * page 2, paragraph 38 - page 3, paragraph 46; figures 1-5 * * page 5, paragraph 63 * * page 10, paragraph 110 - paragraph 117; figure 14 * |