EP1598786 - Apparatus for receiving and distributing cash [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.10.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 22.12.2010 [2010/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Scan Coin Industries AB Jägershillgatan 26 213 75 Malmö / SE | [2005/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Aas, Per Christian Singasteinveien 5C 0198 Oslo / NO | 02 /
Lippert, John-Haakon Fjordveien 71A 3400 Klokkarstau / NO | [2005/47] | Representative(s) | Locke, Andrew Robert, et al Barker Brettell LLP Medina Chambers Town Quay Southampton SO14 2AQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/22] | Locke, Andrew Robert, et al Barker Brettell Medina Chambers Town Quay Southampton SO14 2AQ / GB | ||
Former [2005/47] | Jörgensson, Leif Sixten Awapatent AB Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 05015954.0 | 18.12.2002 | [2005/47] | Priority number, date | US20010025336 | 19.12.2001 Original published format: US 25336 | [2005/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1598786 | Date: | 23.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1598786 | Date: | 22.02.2006 | [2006/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1598786 | Date: | 03.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.01.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G07D3/06, G07F9/08, G07D1/02, G07D3/16 | [2005/47] | CPC: |
G07F9/08 (EP,US);
B65H29/006 (EP,US);
G07D11/00 (EP,US);
G07D11/24 (EP,US);
G07D11/40 (EP,US);
G07D11/50 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/47] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Empfangen und Verteilen von Bargeld | [2005/47] | English: | Apparatus for receiving and distributing cash | [2005/47] | French: | Appareil pour la réception et la distribution d'argent | [2005/47] | Examination procedure | 22.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/47] | 19.05.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.06.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.10.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 20.10.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02790675.9 / EP1466303 | Opposition(s) | 04.09.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.12.2008 | BE | 03.12.2008 | CY | 03.12.2008 | CZ | 03.12.2008 | DK | 03.12.2008 | EE | 03.12.2008 | FI | 03.12.2008 | NL | 03.12.2008 | SI | 03.12.2008 | SK | 03.12.2008 | TR | 03.12.2008 | IE | 18.12.2008 | LU | 18.12.2008 | CH | 31.12.2008 | LI | 31.12.2008 | MC | 31.12.2008 | BG | 03.03.2009 | GR | 04.03.2009 | PT | 04.05.2009 | [2010/51] |
Former [2010/38] | AT | 03.12.2008 | |
BE | 03.12.2008 | ||
CY | 03.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2008 | ||
DK | 03.12.2008 | ||
EE | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
SK | 03.12.2008 | ||
TR | 03.12.2008 | ||
IE | 18.12.2008 | ||
LU | 18.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/36] | AT | 03.12.2008 | |
BE | 03.12.2008 | ||
CY | 03.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2008 | ||
DK | 03.12.2008 | ||
EE | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
SK | 03.12.2008 | ||
IE | 18.12.2008 | ||
LU | 18.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/33] | AT | 03.12.2008 | |
BE | 03.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2008 | ||
DK | 03.12.2008 | ||
EE | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
SK | 03.12.2008 | ||
IE | 18.12.2008 | ||
LU | 18.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/47] | AT | 03.12.2008 | |
BE | 03.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2008 | ||
DK | 03.12.2008 | ||
EE | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
SK | 03.12.2008 | ||
IE | 18.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/46] | AT | 03.12.2008 | |
BE | 03.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2008 | ||
DK | 03.12.2008 | ||
EE | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
SK | 03.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/45] | AT | 03.12.2008 | |
BE | 03.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2008 | ||
EE | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
SK | 03.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/41] | AT | 03.12.2008 | |
BE | 03.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2008 | ||
EE | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | BE | 03.12.2008 | |
EE | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/32] | BE | 03.12.2008 | |
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/27] | FI | 03.12.2008 | |
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4304247 (HASEGAWA KAIICHI) [A] 1-4,9,10 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0803844 (MARS INC [US]) [A] 6-8 * column 4, line 5 - column 5, line 34 * * column 6, line 47 - column 7, line 57 * * figures 2,4,5 *; | [A]WO9743739 (MAG NIF INC [US]); | [A]EP0831431 (LAUREL BANK MACHINE CO [JP]) [A] 1,10 * column 5, line 12 - column 13, line 19 * * figures 1,3 *; | [A]EP0911769 (ASAHI SEIKO CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-4,10 * the whole document * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0049] * * figures 1-4,8,9,14 *; | [A]US2001004582 (UMEDA MASAYOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1,5,6,10 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0028] * * figures 1,3,6,7 * | by applicant | US4304247 | EP0911769 |