Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7334338 | Global Dossier | 26.02.2008 | B2 | US2006021227 | 02.02.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2004224477 | 30.07.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100644958B | Global Dossier | 10.11.2006 | B1 | KR20060048813 | 18.05.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2004224477 | 30.07.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4576919B | Global Dossier | 10.11.2010 | B2 | JP2006042897 | 16.02.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2004224477 | 30.07.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1621300 | Global Dossier | 05.03.2008 | B1 | EP1621300 | 01.02.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2004224477 | 30.07.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE387996T | 15.03.2008 | T1 | Priority number | Date | JP2004224477 | 30.07.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN100460169C | 11.02.2009 | C | CN1727133 | 01.02.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2004224477 | 30.07.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE602005005113T | 12.03.2009 | T2 | DE602005005113D1 | 17.04.2008 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP2004224477 | 30.07.2004 |