EP1621300 - Reciprocatory dry shaver [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.01.2009 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 22.12.2010 [2010/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS, LTD. 1048, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu 571-8686 / JP | [2006/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shiba, Takeshi Matsushita Electric Works , Ltd 1048, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8686 / JP | 02 /
Motohashi, Ryo Matsushita Electric Works , Ltd 1048, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8686 / JP | 03 /
Yabuuchi, Hidekazu Matsushita Electric Works , Ltd 1048, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8686 / JP | 04 /
Shimizu, Hiroaki Matsushita Electric Works , Ltd 1048, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8686 / JP | [2006/05] | Representative(s) | Appelt, Christian W. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Appelt, Christian W. Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/05] | Appelt, Christian W. FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Anwaltssozietät Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05015984.7 | 22.07.2005 | [2006/05] | Priority number, date | JP20040224477 | 30.07.2004 Original published format: JP 2004224477 | [2006/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1621300 | Date: | 01.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1621300 | Date: | 05.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B26B19/28, B26B19/04 | [2006/05] | CPC: |
B26B19/282 (EP,US);
B26B19/02 (KR);
B26B19/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/05] | Title | German: | Vibrationsrasierapparat | [2006/05] | English: | Reciprocatory dry shaver | [2006/05] | French: | Rasoir à sec réciprocant | [2006/05] | Examination procedure | 19.04.2006 | Examination requested [2006/24] | 22.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.01.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 11.01.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.12.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.03.2008 | BE | 05.03.2008 | CY | 05.03.2008 | CZ | 05.03.2008 | DK | 05.03.2008 | EE | 05.03.2008 | FI | 05.03.2008 | IT | 05.03.2008 | LT | 05.03.2008 | LV | 05.03.2008 | NL | 05.03.2008 | PL | 05.03.2008 | RO | 05.03.2008 | SI | 05.03.2008 | SK | 05.03.2008 | TR | 05.03.2008 | BG | 05.06.2008 | SE | 05.06.2008 | GR | 06.06.2008 | ES | 16.06.2008 | IS | 05.07.2008 | IE | 22.07.2008 | LU | 22.07.2008 | MC | 31.07.2008 | PT | 05.08.2008 | HU | 06.09.2008 | [2010/51] |
Former [2010/38] | AT | 05.03.2008 | |
BE | 05.03.2008 | ||
CY | 05.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 05.03.2008 | ||
DK | 05.03.2008 | ||
EE | 05.03.2008 | ||
FI | 05.03.2008 | ||
IT | 05.03.2008 | ||
LT | 05.03.2008 | ||
LV | 05.03.2008 | ||
NL | 05.03.2008 | ||
PL | 05.03.2008 | ||
RO | 05.03.2008 | ||
SI | 05.03.2008 | ||
SK | 05.03.2008 | ||
TR | 05.03.2008 | ||
BG | 05.06.2008 | ||
SE | 05.06.2008 | ||
ES | 16.06.2008 | ||
IS | 05.07.2008 | ||
IE | 22.07.2008 | ||
LU | 22.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
PT | 05.08.2008 | ||
HU | 06.09.2008 | ||
Former [2010/36] | AT | 05.03.2008 | |
BE | 05.03.2008 | ||
CY | 05.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 05.03.2008 | ||
DK | 05.03.2008 | ||
EE | 05.03.2008 | ||
FI | 05.03.2008 | ||
IT | 05.03.2008 | ||
LT | 05.03.2008 | ||
LV | 05.03.2008 | ||
NL | 05.03.2008 | ||
PL | 05.03.2008 | ||
RO | 05.03.2008 | ||
SI | 05.03.2008 | ||
SK | 05.03.2008 | ||
BG | 05.06.2008 | ||
SE | 05.06.2008 | ||
ES | 16.06.2008 | ||
IS | 05.07.2008 | ||
IE | 22.07.2008 | ||
LU | 22.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
PT | 05.08.2008 | ||
HU | 06.09.2008 | ||
Former [2010/33] | AT | 05.03.2008 | |
BE | 05.03.2008 | ||
CY | 05.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 05.03.2008 | ||
DK | 05.03.2008 | ||
EE | 05.03.2008 | ||
FI | 05.03.2008 | ||
IT | 05.03.2008 | ||
LT | 05.03.2008 | ||
LV | 05.03.2008 | ||
NL | 05.03.2008 | ||
PL | 05.03.2008 | ||
RO | 05.03.2008 | ||
SI | 05.03.2008 | ||
SK | 05.03.2008 | ||
BG | 05.06.2008 | ||
SE | 05.06.2008 | ||
ES | 16.06.2008 | ||
IS | 05.07.2008 | ||
IE | 22.07.2008 | ||
LU | 22.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
PT | 05.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/41] | AT | 05.03.2008 | |
BE | 05.03.2008 | ||
CY | 05.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 05.03.2008 | ||
DK | 05.03.2008 | ||
EE | 05.03.2008 | ||
FI | 05.03.2008 | ||
IT | 05.03.2008 | ||
LT | 05.03.2008 | ||
LV | 05.03.2008 | ||
NL | 05.03.2008 | ||
PL | 05.03.2008 | ||
RO | 05.03.2008 | ||
SI | 05.03.2008 | ||
SK | 05.03.2008 | ||
BG | 05.06.2008 | ||
SE | 05.06.2008 | ||
ES | 16.06.2008 | ||
IS | 05.07.2008 | ||
IE | 22.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
PT | 05.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/36] | AT | 05.03.2008 | |
BE | 05.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 05.03.2008 | ||
DK | 05.03.2008 | ||
EE | 05.03.2008 | ||
FI | 05.03.2008 | ||
LT | 05.03.2008 | ||
LV | 05.03.2008 | ||
NL | 05.03.2008 | ||
PL | 05.03.2008 | ||
RO | 05.03.2008 | ||
SI | 05.03.2008 | ||
SK | 05.03.2008 | ||
BG | 05.06.2008 | ||
SE | 05.06.2008 | ||
ES | 16.06.2008 | ||
IS | 05.07.2008 | ||
IE | 22.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
PT | 05.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/24] | AT | 05.03.2008 | |
BE | 05.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 05.03.2008 | ||
DK | 05.03.2008 | ||
EE | 05.03.2008 | ||
FI | 05.03.2008 | ||
LT | 05.03.2008 | ||
LV | 05.03.2008 | ||
NL | 05.03.2008 | ||
PL | 05.03.2008 | ||
RO | 05.03.2008 | ||
SI | 05.03.2008 | ||
SK | 05.03.2008 | ||
BG | 05.06.2008 | ||
SE | 05.06.2008 | ||
ES | 16.06.2008 | ||
IS | 05.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
PT | 05.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 05.03.2008 | |
BE | 05.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 05.03.2008 | ||
DK | 05.03.2008 | ||
EE | 05.03.2008 | ||
FI | 05.03.2008 | ||
LT | 05.03.2008 | ||
LV | 05.03.2008 | ||
NL | 05.03.2008 | ||
PL | 05.03.2008 | ||
RO | 05.03.2008 | ||
SI | 05.03.2008 | ||
SK | 05.03.2008 | ||
SE | 05.06.2008 | ||
ES | 16.06.2008 | ||
IS | 05.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
PT | 05.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/18] | AT | 05.03.2008 | |
BE | 05.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 05.03.2008 | ||
DK | 05.03.2008 | ||
FI | 05.03.2008 | ||
LT | 05.03.2008 | ||
LV | 05.03.2008 | ||
NL | 05.03.2008 | ||
PL | 05.03.2008 | ||
RO | 05.03.2008 | ||
SI | 05.03.2008 | ||
SK | 05.03.2008 | ||
SE | 05.06.2008 | ||
ES | 16.06.2008 | ||
IS | 05.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
PT | 05.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | AT | 05.03.2008 | |
BE | 05.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 05.03.2008 | ||
DK | 05.03.2008 | ||
FI | 05.03.2008 | ||
LT | 05.03.2008 | ||
LV | 05.03.2008 | ||
NL | 05.03.2008 | ||
PL | 05.03.2008 | ||
RO | 05.03.2008 | ||
SI | 05.03.2008 | ||
SK | 05.03.2008 | ||
SE | 05.06.2008 | ||
ES | 16.06.2008 | ||
IS | 05.07.2008 | ||
PT | 05.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | AT | 05.03.2008 | |
BE | 05.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 05.03.2008 | ||
DK | 05.03.2008 | ||
FI | 05.03.2008 | ||
LV | 05.03.2008 | ||
NL | 05.03.2008 | ||
PL | 05.03.2008 | ||
RO | 05.03.2008 | ||
SI | 05.03.2008 | ||
SK | 05.03.2008 | ||
SE | 05.06.2008 | ||
ES | 16.06.2008 | ||
IS | 05.07.2008 | ||
PT | 05.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/05] | AT | 05.03.2008 | |
BE | 05.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 05.03.2008 | ||
FI | 05.03.2008 | ||
LV | 05.03.2008 | ||
NL | 05.03.2008 | ||
PL | 05.03.2008 | ||
RO | 05.03.2008 | ||
SI | 05.03.2008 | ||
SK | 05.03.2008 | ||
SE | 05.06.2008 | ||
ES | 16.06.2008 | ||
IS | 05.07.2008 | ||
PT | 05.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | AT | 05.03.2008 | |
BE | 05.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 05.03.2008 | ||
FI | 05.03.2008 | ||
LV | 05.03.2008 | ||
NL | 05.03.2008 | ||
PL | 05.03.2008 | ||
RO | 05.03.2008 | ||
SI | 05.03.2008 | ||
SK | 05.03.2008 | ||
SE | 05.06.2008 | ||
ES | 16.06.2008 | ||
PT | 05.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | AT | 05.03.2008 | |
BE | 05.03.2008 | ||
FI | 05.03.2008 | ||
LV | 05.03.2008 | ||
PL | 05.03.2008 | ||
SI | 05.03.2008 | ||
SE | 05.06.2008 | ||
ES | 16.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | AT | 05.03.2008 | |
BE | 05.03.2008 | ||
FI | 05.03.2008 | ||
LV | 05.03.2008 | ||
PL | 05.03.2008 | ||
SI | 05.03.2008 | ||
ES | 16.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/43] | AT | 05.03.2008 | |
BE | 05.03.2008 | ||
FI | 05.03.2008 | ||
PL | 05.03.2008 | ||
ES | 16.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | AT | 05.03.2008 | |
FI | 05.03.2008 | ||
ES | 16.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/36] | FI | 05.03.2008 | |
ES | 16.06.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3042817 (ADOLF MOHR) [A] 1 * column 2, lines 53-64; figures 1,2 *; | [A]CH425529 (KOBLER & CO [CH]) [A] 1* page 2, lines 20-44; figures 1,3 *; | [A]US4719698 (NINOMIYA KAZUNORI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 8, lines 46-68; figures 6,17 *; | [A]US5473818 (OTSUKA KIYOTAKA [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 4, line 34 - column 6, line 50; figures 2,3,5 *; | [A]WO03041918 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1 * page 11, line 22 - page 12, line 8; figures 2,6 *; | [PX]EP1449627 (IZUMI PROD CO [JP]) [PX] 1 * column 7, line 17 - column 8, line 7; figure 3 * | by applicant | JPH0548870U |