EP1621922 - Projector and liquid crystal panel unit for use in projector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 02.08.2013 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 04.09.2013 [2013/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SANYO ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 5-5, Keihanhondori 2-chome Moriguchi-shi, Osaka 570 / JP | [2006/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yoshimura, Taichi 2-5-12-101, Sagisu, Fukushima-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 553-0002 / JP | 02 /
Furuta, Yoshihiro 26-12-403, Ohtoshimotomachi Neyagawa-shi, Osaka 572-0047 / JP | [2006/05] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/05] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Patentanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05016093.6 | 25.07.2005 | [2006/05] | Priority number, date | JP20040217049 | 26.07.2004 Original published format: JP 2004217049 | [2006/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1621922 | Date: | 01.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1621922 | Date: | 10.01.2007 | [2007/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.12.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/13363, H04N9/31 | [2006/05] | CPC: |
G02F1/133308 (EP,US);
G02F1/13363 (EP,KR,US);
G02B5/30 (KR);
H04N9/3105 (EP,US);
H04N9/317 (EP,US);
G02F2413/01 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [2007/37] |
Former [2006/05] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Projecktor und Flüssigkristallanzeigeeinheit zur Verwendung in einem Projektor | [2006/05] | English: | Projector and liquid crystal panel unit for use in projector | [2006/05] | French: | Projecteur et unité d'affichage à cristaux liquides utilisée dans un projecteur | [2006/05] | Examination procedure | 23.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/23] | 15.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/36] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.06.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1160617 (SONY CORP [JP]) [X] 1,2,5 * claims 6,9 *; | [A]JP2003051357 (JAPAN AVIATION ELECTRON) [A] 1,3,5 * abstract ** figures 2-4 *; | [A]JP2004205593 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) [A] 1,3,5 * abstract * | by applicant | US2002018162 |