EP1605390 - Magnetic card reader and reproduction and demodulation method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.10.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.11.2007 [2007/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nidec Sankyo Corporation 5329, Shimosuwa-machi Suwa-gun Nagano / JP | [2006/35] |
Former [2005/50] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA SANKYO SEIKI SEISAKUSHO 5329, Shimosuwa-machi Suwa-gun Nagano / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yokozawa, Mitsuo c/o KK Sankyo Seiki Seisakusho Suwaminami Works 10801-2 Hara-mura Suwa-gun Nagano / JP | 02 /
Nakamura, Hiroshi c/o KK Sankyo Seiki Seisakusho Suwaminami Works 10801-2 Hara-mura Suwa-gun Nagano / JP | 03 /
Morozumi, Shinya c/o KK Sankyo Seiki Seisakusho Suwaminami Works 10801-2 Hara-mura Suwa-gun Nagano / JP | 04 /
Hoson, Keiji c/o KK Sankyo Seiki Seisakusho Suwaminami Works 10801-2 Hara-mura Suwa-gun Nagano / JP | [2005/50] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/50] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05016112.4 | 23.01.2001 | [2005/50] | Priority number, date | JP20000015010 | 24.01.2000 Original published format: JP 2000015010 | JP20000179431 | 15.06.2000 Original published format: JP 2000179431 | JP20000324439 | 24.10.2000 Original published format: JP 2000324439 | JP20000338901 | 07.11.2000 Original published format: JP 2000338901 | [2005/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1605390 | Date: | 14.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1605390 | Date: | 25.10.2006 | [2006/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G06K7/08, G11B5/008, G11B5/09, G11B20/10, G11B5/02, G11B20/14 | [2005/50] | CPC: |
G11B5/00808 (EP,US);
G06K7/084 (EP,US);
G11B20/10009 (EP,US);
G11B20/10203 (EP,US);
G11B20/10314 (EP,US);
G11B20/14 (EP,US);
G11B5/008 (EP,US);
G11B5/02 (EP,US);
G11B5/09 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/27] |
Former [2005/50] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Magnetkartenleser sowie Wiedergabe- und Demodulationsverfahren | [2005/50] | English: | Magnetic card reader and reproduction and demodulation method | [2005/50] | French: | Lecteur de carte magnétique et méthode de reproduction et de démodulation | [2005/50] | Examination procedure | 25.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/50] | 26.04.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/46] | 21.06.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/46] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01101457.8 / EP1126398 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2007 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0222132 (HONEYWELL INF SYSTEMS [IT]) [X] 1,4,5 * abstract * * page 1, line 1 - line 3 * * page 1, line 35 - line 36 *; | [A]WO9322841 (QUESTECH LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-5* abstract * |