EP1624261 - Engine driven air conditioner and control method therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.08.2008 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SANYO ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 5-5, Keihan-Hondori 2-chome Moriguchi-shi, Osaka / JP | [2006/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ohkawa, Kazunobu D102, 4-8-6, Shironouchi Oizumi-machi Ora-gun Gunma 370-0518 / JP | 02 /
Hirata, Ryota 2-19-1, Sakata Oizumi-machi Ora-gun Gunma 370-0532 / JP | [2006/06] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/06] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Patentanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05016314.6 | 27.07.2005 | [2006/06] | Priority number, date | JP20040220113 | 28.07.2004 Original published format: JP 2004220113 | [2006/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1624261 | Date: | 08.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1624261 | Date: | 17.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F25B27/00 | [2006/06] | CPC: |
F25B27/00 (EP,US);
F25B27/02 (KR);
B60H1/3205 (EP,US);
B60H1/3225 (EP,US);
F24F5/00 (KR);
F25B30/00 (KR);
F25B49/00 (KR);
F25B49/005 (EP);
B60H2001/325 (EP);
B60H2001/327 (EP);
F25B13/00 (EP);
F25B2327/00 (EP);
F25B2600/0261 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, HU, IT [2006/41] |
Former [2006/06] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Motorbetriebene Klimaanlage und Steuerungsverfahren dafür | [2006/06] | English: | Engine driven air conditioner and control method therefor | [2006/06] | French: | Conditionneur d'air à moteur à combustion et procédé pour son contrôle | [2006/06] | Examination procedure | 27.07.2005 | Examination requested [2006/06] | 24.04.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.08.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 31.08.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.07.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH0552445 ; | [A]JP01049861 ; | [DA]JP2001330341 ; | [A]JPH08200879 ; | [A]US2286961 (LARS HANSON) [A] 1,7 * column 3, line 23 - column 6, line 29 *; | [A]EP1335116 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP], et al) [A] 1,7 * paragraphs [0021] , [0022]; figure 2 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930708), vol. 017, no. 362, Database accession no. (M - 1441), & JP05052445 A 19930302 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 1,7 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010605), vol. 2000, no. 18, & JP01049861 A 19890227 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1,7 * abstract * | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20020403), vol. 2002, no. 03, & JP2001330341 A 20011130 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD; TOKYO GAS CO LTD) [DA] 1,7 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19961226), vol. 1996, no. 12, & JP08200879 A 19960806 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [A] 1,7 * abstract * | by applicant | JP2001330341 |