EP1598432 - Array based methods for sythesizing nucleic acid mixtures [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.06.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.07.2009 [2009/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agilent Technologies, Inc. - a Delaware Corporation - 5301 Stevens Creek Boulevard Santa Clara CA 95051 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/04] | For all designated states Agilent Technologies, Inc. - a Delaware Corporation - 5301 Stevens Creek Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95051 / US | ||
Former [2005/47] | For all designated states Agilent Technologies, Inc. 395 Page Mill Road Palo Alto CA 94306 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wolber, Paul K. 531 Torwood Lane Los Altos, CA 94022 / US | 02 /
Amorese, Douglas A. 357 S. El Monte Avenue Los Altos, CA 94022 / US | 03 /
Kincaid, Robert H. 519 Spindrift Way Half Moon Bay, CA 94019 / US | 04 /
Ilsley, Diane D. 482 Curie Drive San Jose, CA 95123 / US | 05 /
Atwell, Andrew S. 515 S. Bernardo Avenue Apt. 1 Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US | [2006/15] |
Former [2005/47] | 01 /
Wolber, Paul K. 531 Torwood Lane Los Altos, CA 94022 / US | ||
02 /
Amorese, Douglas A. 357 S. El Monte Avenue Los Altos, CA 94022 / US | |||
03 /
Kincaid, Robert H. 519 Spindrift Way Half Moon Bay, CA 94019 / US | |||
04 /
Ilsley, Diane D. 6264 Hopi Circle San Jose, CA 95123 / US | |||
05 /
Atwell, Andrew S. 515 S. Bernardo Avenue Apt. 1 Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US | Representative(s) | Tollett, Ian, et al Williams Powell 44 Prespect Place Bromley, Kent BR2 9HN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/47] | Tollett, Ian, et al Williams Powell Morley House 26-30 Holborn Viaduct London EC1A 2BP / GB | Application number, filing date | 05016660.2 | 31.07.2001 | [2005/47] | Priority number, date | US20000628472 | 31.07.2000 Original published format: US 628472 | [2005/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1598432 | Date: | 23.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1598432 | Date: | 07.06.2006 | [2006/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68, B01J19/00 | [2006/23] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6883 (EP,US);
B82Y30/00 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6806 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6837 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6876 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00497 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00572 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00574 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00576 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00585 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00596 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00605 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00608 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00617 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00626 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00659 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00675 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00722 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/158 (EP,US);
C40B40/06 (EP,US);
C40B50/14 (EP,US);
C40B70/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6806, C12Q2565/525, C12Q2525/131, C12Q2521/301 (US,EP);
C12Q1/6837, C12Q2565/537, C12Q2525/161 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6837, C12Q2565/537, C12Q2525/161, C12Q2521/301 (US,EP)
|
Former IPC [2005/47] | C12Q1/68 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/07] |
Former [2005/47] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Array-basierende Methoden zur Synthese von Nukleinsäuregemischen | [2005/47] | English: | Array based methods for sythesizing nucleic acid mixtures | [2005/47] | French: | Procédés de synthèse d'acides nucléiques basés sur un arrangement | [2005/47] | Examination procedure | 16.08.2005 | Examination requested [2005/47] | 14.11.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.02.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/31] | 05.02.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.03.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2009/31] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01306573.5 / EP1180548 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2008 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9317126 (NEW YORK HEALTH RES INST [US]) [A] 1-10 * page 2, paragraph 3 - page 6, paragraph 3 * * page 9, paragraph 2 - page 10, paragraph 3 * * page 31, paragraph 3 - page 33, paragraph 2 * * figures 1A,4 ** claims 12,20,21,52 *; | [DX]US5795714 (CANTOR CHARLES R [US], et al) [DX] 1-10 * column 4, line 35 - line 47 * * column 14, line 34 - column 15, line 55 * * example 18 * * figure 14 * * claims 1,6,8,10,15,22,26 *; | [A]WO9907888 (HARVARD COLLEGE [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * line 1 - page 6, line 12 * * page 15, line 13 - line 20 * * example 1 * * claims 8,16,21,22,25 *; | [A] - BULYK M L ET AL, "Quantifying DNA-protein interactions by double-stranded DNA arrays", NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, NATURE PUBLISHING, US, (199906), vol. 17, no. 6, ISSN 1087-0156, pages 573 - 577, XP002174590 [A] 1-10 * abstract * * page 573, column L, paragraph 2 - column R, paragraph 2 * * page 576, column R, paragraph 2 - paragraph 4 * * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/9878 |