21.09.2012 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 24.10.2012 [2012/43] |
14.10.2011 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 16.11.2011 [2011/46] |
07.10.2011 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
07.10.2011 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
08.07.2011 |
Change - applicant |
published on 10.08.2011 [2011/32] |
08.07.2011 |
Change - inventor |
published on 10.08.2011 [2011/32] |
29.06.2011 |
New entry: Decision on request for further processing |
|
29.06.2011 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
29.06.2011 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
06.04.2011 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
20.01.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.10.2010 |
Change: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
22.10.2010 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 24.11.2010 [2010/47] |
08.10.2010 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
13.09.2010 |
New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings |
|
03.02.2010 |
Change: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.02.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.11.2009 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
27.01.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.11.2008 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
13.11.2008 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
04.09.2008 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
29.05.2008 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
31.01.2008 |
Change: Renewal fee paid |
|
31.01.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.01.2008 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
29.06.2007 |
New entry: Decision on request for further processing |
|
29.06.2007 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
29.06.2007 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
29.06.2007 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
12.04.2007 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
02.02.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.12.2006 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
01.09.2006 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 04.10.2006 [2006/40] |
01.09.2006 |
First examination report |
|
26.08.2006 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
11.08.2006 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 13.09.2006 [2006/37] |
24.01.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.12.2005 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 01.02.2006 [2006/05] |
11.08.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|