EP1624351 - Dynamic schema for unified plant model [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.03.2014 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rockwell Software Inc. 2424 South 102nd Street West Allis Wisconsin 53227 / US | [2006/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hood, Gavan W. 70 Koreelah Street Upper Lockyer, Queensland 4352 / AU | [2013/01] |
Former [2006/06] | 01 /
Hood, Gavan W. 70 Koreelah Street Upper Lockyer Queensland 4352 / AU | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/19] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/28] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/30] | Englaender, Klaus, et al HML Patentanwälte Schraudolphstrasse 3 80799 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/06] | Jung HML Schraudolphstrasse 3 80799 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05016793.1 | 02.08.2005 | [2006/06] | Priority number, date | US20040909565 | 02.08.2004 Original published format: US 909565 | [2006/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1624351 | Date: | 08.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1624351 | Date: | 08.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/042, G05B19/05 | [2006/06] | CPC: |
G05B19/0426 (EP,US);
G05B19/00 (KR);
G05B2219/23255 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/06] | Title | German: | Dynamisches Schema für ein einheitliches Anlagenmodell | [2006/06] | English: | Dynamic schema for unified plant model | [2006/06] | French: | Schéma dynamique pour un modèle unifié d'une installation | [2006/06] | Examination procedure | 17.01.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.08.2006 | Examination requested [2006/38] | 17.11.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.05.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.03.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 22.03.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.11.2011 | Opposition(s) | 11.02.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.08.2005 | AT | 08.05.2013 | BE | 08.05.2013 | CY | 08.05.2013 | CZ | 08.05.2013 | DK | 08.05.2013 | EE | 08.05.2013 | FI | 08.05.2013 | IT | 08.05.2013 | LT | 08.05.2013 | LV | 08.05.2013 | MC | 08.05.2013 | NL | 08.05.2013 | PL | 08.05.2013 | RO | 08.05.2013 | SE | 08.05.2013 | SI | 08.05.2013 | SK | 08.05.2013 | TR | 08.05.2013 | IE | 02.08.2013 | LU | 02.08.2013 | BG | 08.08.2013 | GR | 09.08.2013 | ES | 19.08.2013 | CH | 31.08.2013 | LI | 31.08.2013 | IS | 08.09.2013 | PT | 09.09.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 08.05.2013 | |
BE | 08.05.2013 | ||
CY | 08.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2013 | ||
DK | 08.05.2013 | ||
EE | 08.05.2013 | ||
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
IT | 08.05.2013 | ||
LT | 08.05.2013 | ||
LV | 08.05.2013 | ||
MC | 08.05.2013 | ||
NL | 08.05.2013 | ||
PL | 08.05.2013 | ||
RO | 08.05.2013 | ||
SE | 08.05.2013 | ||
SI | 08.05.2013 | ||
SK | 08.05.2013 | ||
TR | 08.05.2013 | ||
IE | 02.08.2013 | ||
BG | 08.08.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
ES | 19.08.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | AT | 08.05.2013 | |
BE | 08.05.2013 | ||
CY | 08.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2013 | ||
DK | 08.05.2013 | ||
EE | 08.05.2013 | ||
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
IT | 08.05.2013 | ||
LT | 08.05.2013 | ||
LV | 08.05.2013 | ||
MC | 08.05.2013 | ||
NL | 08.05.2013 | ||
PL | 08.05.2013 | ||
RO | 08.05.2013 | ||
SE | 08.05.2013 | ||
SI | 08.05.2013 | ||
SK | 08.05.2013 | ||
IE | 02.08.2013 | ||
BG | 08.08.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
ES | 19.08.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 08.05.2013 | |
BE | 08.05.2013 | ||
CY | 08.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2013 | ||
DK | 08.05.2013 | ||
EE | 08.05.2013 | ||
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
IT | 08.05.2013 | ||
LT | 08.05.2013 | ||
LV | 08.05.2013 | ||
MC | 08.05.2013 | ||
NL | 08.05.2013 | ||
PL | 08.05.2013 | ||
RO | 08.05.2013 | ||
SE | 08.05.2013 | ||
SI | 08.05.2013 | ||
SK | 08.05.2013 | ||
BG | 08.08.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
ES | 19.08.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 08.05.2013 | |
BE | 08.05.2013 | ||
CY | 08.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2013 | ||
DK | 08.05.2013 | ||
EE | 08.05.2013 | ||
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
IT | 08.05.2013 | ||
LT | 08.05.2013 | ||
LV | 08.05.2013 | ||
NL | 08.05.2013 | ||
PL | 08.05.2013 | ||
RO | 08.05.2013 | ||
SE | 08.05.2013 | ||
SI | 08.05.2013 | ||
SK | 08.05.2013 | ||
BG | 08.08.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
ES | 19.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 08.05.2013 | |
BE | 08.05.2013 | ||
CY | 08.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2013 | ||
DK | 08.05.2013 | ||
EE | 08.05.2013 | ||
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
IT | 08.05.2013 | ||
LT | 08.05.2013 | ||
LV | 08.05.2013 | ||
PL | 08.05.2013 | ||
RO | 08.05.2013 | ||
SE | 08.05.2013 | ||
SI | 08.05.2013 | ||
SK | 08.05.2013 | ||
BG | 08.08.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
ES | 19.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 08.05.2013 | |
BE | 08.05.2013 | ||
CY | 08.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2013 | ||
DK | 08.05.2013 | ||
EE | 08.05.2013 | ||
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
LT | 08.05.2013 | ||
LV | 08.05.2013 | ||
PL | 08.05.2013 | ||
SE | 08.05.2013 | ||
SI | 08.05.2013 | ||
SK | 08.05.2013 | ||
BG | 08.08.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
ES | 19.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 08.05.2013 | |
BE | 08.05.2013 | ||
CY | 08.05.2013 | ||
DK | 08.05.2013 | ||
EE | 08.05.2013 | ||
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
LT | 08.05.2013 | ||
LV | 08.05.2013 | ||
PL | 08.05.2013 | ||
SE | 08.05.2013 | ||
SI | 08.05.2013 | ||
BG | 08.08.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
ES | 19.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/06] | AT | 08.05.2013 | |
BE | 08.05.2013 | ||
CY | 08.05.2013 | ||
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
LT | 08.05.2013 | ||
LV | 08.05.2013 | ||
PL | 08.05.2013 | ||
SE | 08.05.2013 | ||
SI | 08.05.2013 | ||
BG | 08.08.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
ES | 19.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/02] | AT | 08.05.2013 | |
CY | 08.05.2013 | ||
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
LT | 08.05.2013 | ||
LV | 08.05.2013 | ||
PL | 08.05.2013 | ||
SE | 08.05.2013 | ||
SI | 08.05.2013 | ||
BG | 08.08.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
ES | 19.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 08.05.2013 | |
CY | 08.05.2013 | ||
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
LT | 08.05.2013 | ||
PL | 08.05.2013 | ||
SE | 08.05.2013 | ||
SI | 08.05.2013 | ||
BG | 08.08.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
ES | 19.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 08.05.2013 | |
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
LT | 08.05.2013 | ||
PL | 08.05.2013 | ||
SE | 08.05.2013 | ||
SI | 08.05.2013 | ||
BG | 08.08.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
ES | 19.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 08.05.2013 | |
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
LT | 08.05.2013 | ||
SE | 08.05.2013 | ||
SI | 08.05.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
ES | 19.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 08.05.2013 | |
LT | 08.05.2013 | ||
ES | 19.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 08.05.2013 | |
PT | 09.09.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US6446202 (KRIVOSHEIN KENNETH D [US], et al) [Y] 20* column 18, line 1 - line 38 *; | [XY]US6643555 (ELLER THOMAS [DE], et al) [X] 1-19 * column 1, line 66 - column 3, line 25 * * column 5, line 53 - column 7, line 10 * * column 8, line 34 - line 59 * * column 9, line 3 - column 10, line 7 * * column 12, line 14 - column 13, line 45 * [Y] 20; | [X] - PITZEK S ET AL, "Configuration and management of a real-time smart transducer network", EMERGING TECHNOLOGIES AND FACTORY AUTOMATION, 2003. PROCEEDINGS. ETFA '03. IEEE CONFERENCE SEPT. 16-19, 2003, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20030916), vol. 1, ISBN 0-7803-7937-3, pages 407 - 414, XP010670457 [X] 1-8 * abstract * * page 408, column R * * page 409, column R - page 412, column R * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ETFA.2003.1247735 | by applicant | US6446202 | US6643555 | - PITZEK, S. ET AL., "Configuration and Management of a Real-Time Smart Transducer Network", EMERGING TECHNOLOGIES AND FACTORY AUTOMATION, 2003, PROCEEDINGS ETFA '03, IEEE CONFERENCE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20030916), vol. 1, no. 16, doi:doi:10.1109/ETFA.2003.1247735, pages 407 - 414, XP010670457 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ETFA.2003.1247735 |