Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2006038376 | Global Dossier | 23.02.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2004240993 | 20.08.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2006056410 | Global Dossier | 02.03.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2004240993 | 20.08.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1627808 | Global Dossier | 19.03.2008 | B1 | EP1627808 | 22.02.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2004240993 | 20.08.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN100436245C | 26.11.2008 | C | CN1740044 | 01.03.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2004240993 | 20.08.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE602005005400T | 20.11.2008 | T2 | DE602005005400D1 | 30.04.2008 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP2004240993 | 20.08.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI285173B | 11.08.2007 | B | TW200607697 | 01.03.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2004240993 | 20.08.2004 |