EP1627808 - Bicycle headset arrangement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.01.2009 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.01.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.02.2009 [2009/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SHIMANO INC. 3-77, Oimatsu-cho Sakai-ku Sakai City Osaka 590-8577 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/31] | For all designated states SHIMANO INC. 3-77 Oimatsu-cho, Sakai-ku, Sakai City Osaka 590-8577 / JP | ||
Former [2006/08] | For all designated states SHIMANO INC. 77 Oimatsu-cho 3-cho Sakai-shi Osaka 590-8577 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Okajima, Shinpei 3-2-16, Midorigaoka Izumi, Osaka / JP | 02 /
Goto, Masashi 2-468-1-908, Higashiuenoshiba Sakai Osaka 591-8035 / JP | [2006/08] | Representative(s) | Grosse Schumacher Knauer von Hirschhausen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Nymphenburger Strasse 14 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | Grosse - Schumacher - Knauer - von Hirschhausen Nymphenburger Strasse 14 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/30] | Grosse, Wolfgang, et al Grosse - Schumacher - Knauer - von Hirschhausen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Nymphenburger Strasse 14 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/11] | Grosse, Wolfgang, et al Grosse - Schumacher - Knauer - von Hirschhausen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Nymphenburger Strasse 14 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/08] | GROSSE BOCKHORNI SCHUMACHER Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Forstenrieder Allee 59 81476 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05017424.2 | 10.08.2005 | [2006/08] | Priority number, date | JP20040240993 | 20.08.2004 Original published format: JP 2004240993 | [2006/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1627808 | Date: | 22.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1627808 | Date: | 19.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B62K19/32, B62K21/06, B62K21/18 | [2006/08] | CPC: |
B62K21/06 (EP,US);
B62K21/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE [2006/43] |
Former [2006/08] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Lenkkopf für ein Fahrrad | [2006/08] | English: | Bicycle headset arrangement | [2006/08] | French: | Tube de direction pour bicyclette | [2006/08] | Examination procedure | 07.04.2006 | Examination requested [2006/22] | 22.08.2006 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 31.10.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.12.2006 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 30.01.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 30.01.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.12.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 27.09.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 27.09.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 27.09.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 27.09.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 27.09.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 27.09.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 27.09.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 27.09.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 27.09.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 27.09.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 27.09.2006 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 27.09.2006 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 27.09.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 27.09.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 27.09.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 27.09.2006 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 27.09.2006 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 27.09.2006 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 27.09.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 27.09.2006 | LV   M01   Not yet paid | 27.09.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 27.09.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 27.09.2006 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 27.09.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 27.09.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 27.09.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 27.09.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 27.09.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 27.09.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0541070 (SHIMANO KK [JP]) [AD] 1 * abstract ** figure - *; | [A]US5454281 (CHI YI C [TW]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 19 - column 3, line 17 * * figure - *; | [A]GB2328913 (LIN JIN CHEN [TW], et al) [A] 1 * page 5, line 1 - page 6, line 4 * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]US5893574 (CAMPAGNOLO VALENTINO [IT]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 32 - column 3, line 9 * * figure - *; | [A]US2003121357 (JIANG CHENG-XUN [TW]) [A] 1 * page 1, paragraph 11 - paragraph 16 * * figure - * | by applicant | TW225753B | US5095770 | US5330220 |