EP1625904 - Device for heating or keeping warm liquids [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.01.2010 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.01.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.02.2010 [2010/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aleris Recycling (German Works) GmbH Aluminiumstrasse 3 41515 Grevenbroich / DE | [2007/15] |
Former [2006/07] | For all designated states Vaw-Imco Guss und Recycling GmbH Aluminiumstrasse 3 41515 Grevenbroich / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Scharf-Bergmann, Roland Dr. Kottmann Strasse 75 c 41516 Grevenbroich / DE | [2006/07] | Representative(s) | Heselberger, Johannes Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Heselberger, Johannes Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle - Pagenberg - Dost Altenburg - Geissler Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/07] | Heselberger, Johannes Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05017674.2 | 12.08.2005 | [2006/07] | Priority number, date | DE20041039388 | 13.08.2004 Original published format: DE102004039388 | [2006/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1625904 | Date: | 15.02.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B22D41/01, C22B9/05, C22B21/06, F27B14/14, F27D1/18, C21C7/00 | [2006/07] | CPC: |
C22B21/0084 (EP);
B22D41/01 (EP);
C22B21/064 (EP);
F27B14/14 (EP);
F27D1/1808 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/07] | Title | German: | Heizvorrichtung zum Erwärmen beziehungsweise Warmhalten von Flüssigkeiten | [2006/07] | English: | Device for heating or keeping warm liquids | [2006/07] | French: | Dispositif pour chauffer ou tenir chaud des liquides | [2006/07] | Examination procedure | 07.08.2006 | Examination requested [2006/38] | 05.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.08.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/08] | 22.09.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2009 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0177908 (NIPPON KOKAN KK [JP]) [X] 1,5-8 * page 1, line 1 - line 26 ** figure 1 *; | [X]EP0217094 (LINDE AG [DE]) [X] 1-8 * page 1, line 15 - page 2, line 14 * * figure 1 * |