EP1679427 - Turbogenerator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.08.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.09.2012 [2012/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HITACHI, LTD. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/28] | For all designated states HITACHI, LTD. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakahara, Akihito@c/o Hitachi, Ltd., Int. Prop. Gr. 12th Floor Marunouchi Cent. Bldg 1-6-1, Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 02 /
Takahashi, Kazuhiko@c/o Hitachi, Ltd., Int. Pr. Gr. 12th Floor Marunouchi Cent. Bldg 1-6-1, Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 03 /
Ide, Kazumasa@c/o Hitachi, Ltd., Int. Prop. Gr. 12th Floor Marunouchi Cent. Bldg 1-6-1, Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 04 /
Kimura, Mamoru@c/o Hitachi, Ltd., Int. Prop. Gr. 12th Floor Marunouchi Cent. Bldg 1-6-1, Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | [2011/41] |
Former [2006/28] | 01 /
Nakahara, Akihito c/o Hitachi, Ltd., Int. Prop. Gr. 12th Floor Marunouchi Cent. Bldg 1-6-1, Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | ||
02 /
Takahashi, Kazuhiko c/o Hitachi, Ltd., Int. Pr. Gr. 12th Floor Marunouchi Cent. Bldg 1-6-1, Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | |||
03 /
Ide, Kazumasa c/o Hitachi, Ltd., Int. Prop. Gr. 12th Floor Marunouchi Cent. Bldg 1-6-1, Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | |||
04 /
Kimura, Mamoru c/o Hitachi, Ltd., Int. Prop. Gr. 12th Floor Marunouchi Cent. Bldg 1-6-1, Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | Representative(s) | Beetz & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstraße 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/41] | Beetz & Partner Patentanwälte Steinsdorfstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/38] | Beetz & Partner Patentanwälte Steinsdorfstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/28] | Beetz & Partner Steinsdorfstrasse 10 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05017866.4 | 17.08.2005 | [2006/28] | Priority number, date | JP20040372481 | 24.12.2004 Original published format: JP 2004372481 | [2006/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1679427 | Date: | 12.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1679427 | Date: | 17.02.2010 | [2010/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1679427 | Date: | 12.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.01.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F01D15/10, F02C7/268, H02P9/08 | [2006/28] | CPC: |
F02C7/268 (EP,US);
F01D15/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2010/42] |
Former [2006/28] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Turbogenerator | [2006/28] | English: | Turbogenerator | [2006/28] | French: | Turbo-générateur | [2006/28] | Examination procedure | 28.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/20] | 20.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.08.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 23.09.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 02.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.05.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 10.05.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP11002470.0 / EP2372106 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.04.2010 | Opposition(s) | 13.07.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3821633 (NEASHAM D, et al) [Y] 2 * figure 1 *; | [A]US3863137 (MISHIMA NOBUO, et al) [A] 1-4,9 * columns 2-4; figure 2 *; | [XY]US2004027077 (XU MINGZHOU [US], et al) [X] 1,3,4,9 * the whole document * [Y] 2; | [A]US2004056487 (SARLIOGLU BULENT [US], et al) [A] 1* figure 1 *; | [XY]WO2004055960 (HONEYWELL INT INC [US]) [X] 1,3,4,9 * the whole document * [Y] 2 | by applicant | JP2003515308 |