EP1757840 - Continuously variable transmission [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.02.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.02.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.03.2008 [2008/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Magna Drivetrain AG & Co KG Industriestrasse 35 8502 Lannach / AT | [2007/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hasewend, Wolfram Dr. Petrifeldstr. 124 8041 Graz / AT | [2007/09] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/09] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05018514.9 | 25.08.2005 | [2007/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1757840 | Date: | 28.02.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F16H15/26, F16H15/28, F16H15/30 | [2007/09] | CPC: |
F16H15/26 (EP);
F16H15/28 (EP);
F16H15/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | [2007/44] |
Former [2007/09] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Stufenloses Getriebe | [2007/09] | English: | Continuously variable transmission | [2007/09] | French: | Transmission à variation continue | [2007/09] | Examination procedure | 29.08.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/10] | 16.10.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2008/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US1146982 (WEISS CARL W [US]) [X] 1-10,14,15 * figures 1-12 *[Y] 14; | [XY]DE2422789 (UHING JOACHIM ING) [X] 1-13,15-36 * figures 1-11 * [Y] 14; | [XY]GB2028441 (COLES D N) [X] 1-10 * the whole document * [Y] 14 |