EP1630187 - Sulfonic group-containing polyarylene block copolymer, process for production thereof, solid polymer electrolyte and proton conductive membrane [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.03.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.03.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.04.2009 [2009/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JSR Corporation 6-10, Tsukiji 5-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | [2006/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Okada, Takashi, JSR CORPORATION 6-10, Tsukiji 5-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Shinoda, Mayumi 9-21-101, Takaokadai 5-chome Suzuka-shi Mie / JP | 03 /
Yoshii, Kimihiko, JSR CORPORATION 6-10, Tsukiji 5-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Konno, Yousuke, JSR CORPORATION 6-10, Tsukiji 5-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | 05 /
Otsuki, Toshihiro, JSR CORPORATION 6-10, Tsukiji 5-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | 06 /
Goto, Kohei, JSR CORPORATION 6-10, Tsukiji 5-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | [2006/09] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/09] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05018539.6 | 25.08.2005 | [2006/09] | Priority number, date | JP20040250560 | 30.08.2004 Original published format: JP 2004250560 | [2006/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1630187 | Date: | 01.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1630187 | Date: | 21.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C08G61/12, C08L65/00, B01D71/80, C08J5/22, H01M8/10 | [2006/09] | CPC: |
B01D71/80 (EP,US);
C08G61/12 (EP,KR,US);
B01D71/5223 (EP,KR,US);
B01D71/66 (EP,KR,US);
B01D71/82 (EP,US);
C08J5/22 (KR);
C08J5/2256 (EP,US);
C08L65/00 (EP,US);
H01M8/1023 (EP,US);
B01D71/68 (EP,US);
B01D71/72 (EP,US);
C08J2365/00 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2006/45] |
Former [2006/09] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Sulfongruppen-haltige Polyarylen-Block-Copolymere, Verfahren für deren Herstellung, fester Polymerelektrolyt und protonenleitende Membran | [2006/09] | English: | Sulfonic group-containing polyarylene block copolymer, process for production thereof, solid polymer electrolyte and proton conductive membrane | [2006/09] | French: | Copolymères séquencés de polyarylènes contenant des groupes sulfoniques, procédé pour leur préparation, électrolyte polymère solide et membrane conductrice de protons | [2006/09] | Examination procedure | 17.08.2006 | Examination requested [2006/40] | 11.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.04.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 04.04.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.02.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2002172850 (ASANO YOICHI [JP], et al); | [X]US2004121211 (ASANO YOICHI [JP], et al); | [PX]EP1524288 (JSR CORP [JP]) |