EP1637762 - Brake pad support [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.08.2011 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.08.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.09.2011 [2011/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wabco Radbremsen GmbH Bärlochweg 25 68229 Mannheim / DE | [2006/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kloos, Eugen Falltorstrasse 14 64625 Bensheim / DE | 02 /
Blatt, Peter Fahrenbacher Str. 6 64658 Fürth / DE | 03 /
Steinmetz, Andreas Lettengasse 4 76889 Gleishorbach / DE | 04 /
Keller, Marcus Friedrichstrasse 13 69469 Weinheim / DE | 05 /
Harder, Markus Georg-Melerstr. 2 68766 Hockenheim / DE | [2006/20] |
Former [2006/12] | 01 /
Kloos, Eugen Falltorstrasse 14 64625 Bensheim / DE | ||
02 /
Blatt, Peter Eichenweg 24 69509 Mörlenbach / DE | |||
03 /
Steinmetz, Andreas Lettengasse 4 76889 Gleishorbach / DE | |||
04 /
Keller, Marcus Friedrichstrasse 13 69469 Weinheim / DE | |||
05 /
Harder, Markus Georg-Melerstr. 2 68766 Hockenheim / DE | Representative(s) | Leinweber & Zimmermann Patentanwalts-PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Viktualienmarkt 8 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Leinweber & Zimmermann European Patent Attorneys Patentanwälte Rosental 7 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/12] | Leinweber & Zimmermann Rosental 7, II Aufgang 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05019012.3 | 01.09.2005 | [2006/12] | Priority number, date | DE20041045223 | 17.09.2004 Original published format: DE102004045223 | [2006/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1637762 | Date: | 22.03.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1637762 | Date: | 16.07.2008 | [2008/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F16D65/092, F16D55/22, F16D69/04 | [2008/29] | CPC: |
F16D65/095 (EP);
F16D2055/0008 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2006/12] | F16D69/04 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2009/13] |
Former [2006/12] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Bremsenträger | [2006/12] | English: | Brake pad support | [2006/12] | French: | Support pour garniture de frein | [2006/12] | Examination procedure | 11.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/43] | 09.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.01.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 22.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 01.04.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/38] | 05.05.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/38] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.10.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2010 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE4126339 (TEVES GMBH ALFRED [DE]) [X] 1-13 * figure 8 *; | [X]EP0641949 (PERROT BREMSEN GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]WO0144676 (DELPHI TECH INC [US]) [A] 1-13* the whole document *; | [A]DE10063787 (PORSCHE AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-13 * figure 1 * |