EP1632941 - Optical pickup and optical disc device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 10.12.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.12.2010 | Refusal of application | published on 12.01.2011 [2011/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/10] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Seo, Katsuhiro c/o SONY CORPORATION 7-35-Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Kato, Yoshiaki c/o SONY CORPORATION 7-35-Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Okamoto, Yoshiki c/o SONY CORPORATION 7-35-Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Yonezawa, Takeshi c/o SONY CORPORATION 7-35-Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [2006/10] | Representative(s) | Melzer, Wolfgang Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 33 06 09 80066 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/10] | Melzer, Wolfgang Patentanwälte Mitscherlich & Partner, Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05019109.7 | 02.09.2005 | [2006/10] | Priority number, date | JP20040256821 | 03.09.2004 Original published format: JP 2004256821 | [2006/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1632941 | Date: | 08.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1632941 | Date: | 21.03.2007 | [2007/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/135 | [2006/10] | CPC: |
G11B7/13927 (EP,US);
G11B7/1376 (EP,KR,US);
G11B7/24038 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2007/48] |
Former [2006/10] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Optisches Abtastgerät und optische Platteneinheit | [2006/10] | English: | Optical pickup and optical disc device | [2006/10] | French: | Tête de lecture optique et appareil de disque optique | [2006/10] | Examination procedure | 05.09.2007 | Examination requested [2007/42] | 22.09.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 29.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.10.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 26.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.08.2010 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 25.08.2010 | 24.08.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2011/02] | 25.08.2010 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 03.09.2010 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2011/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2010 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1043615 (SONY CORP [JP]) [X] 1-9 * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0048] * * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0055] * * paragraph [0063] - paragraph [0065] * * paragraphs [0069] , [0079] * * figures 1,10,11 *; | [X]EP1205923 (NEC CORP [JP]) [X] 1-9 * paragraphs [0057] , [0058] , [0060] * * figures 9,10 *; | [X]EP1420398 (PIONEER CORP [JP]) [X] 1-9 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0048] * * figures 3,5 *; | [E]EP1596384 (CANON KK [JP]) [E] 1-9 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0030] ** figure 1 * | Examination | US2002003755 | US2002093744 | EP1575040 |