EP1647722 - Cylinder locking mechanism [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.10.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 08.09.2010 [2010/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rheinmetall Landsysteme GmbH Dr.-Hell-Strasse 24107 Kiel / DE | [2006/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wintjen, Jan Triangel 48 24229 Schwedeneck / DE | [2006/16] | Representative(s) | Dietrich, Barbara Thul Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Derendorfer Allee 6 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/16] | Dietrich, Barbara Thul Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Rheinmetall Allee 1 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 05019508.0 | 08.09.2005 | [2006/16] | Priority number, date | DE20041049854 | 13.10.2004 Original published format: DE102004049854 | [2006/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1647722 | Date: | 19.04.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1647722 | Date: | 05.12.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.01.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F15B15/26, B62D55/30 | [2006/16] | CPC: |
B62D55/305 (EP);
F15B15/261 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/16] | Title | German: | Verfahrabsicherung für einen Hydraulikzylinder | [2006/16] | English: | Cylinder locking mechanism | [2006/16] | French: | Mécanisme de verrouillage pour cylindre | [2006/16] | Examination procedure | 08.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/16] | 24.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.10.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 16.10.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.09.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 05.12.2007 | CZ | 05.12.2007 | EE | 05.12.2007 | IE | 05.12.2007 | LT | 05.12.2007 | LV | 05.12.2007 | PL | 05.12.2007 | RO | 05.12.2007 | SI | 05.12.2007 | SK | 05.12.2007 | BG | 05.03.2008 | IS | 05.04.2008 | PT | 05.05.2008 | HU | 06.06.2008 | [2010/36] |
Former [2009/45] | CY | 05.12.2007 | |
CZ | 05.12.2007 | ||
EE | 05.12.2007 | ||
IE | 05.12.2007 | ||
LT | 05.12.2007 | ||
LV | 05.12.2007 | ||
PL | 05.12.2007 | ||
RO | 05.12.2007 | ||
SI | 05.12.2007 | ||
SK | 05.12.2007 | ||
BG | 05.03.2008 | ||
IS | 05.04.2008 | ||
PT | 05.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/24] | CZ | 05.12.2007 | |
EE | 05.12.2007 | ||
IE | 05.12.2007 | ||
LT | 05.12.2007 | ||
LV | 05.12.2007 | ||
PL | 05.12.2007 | ||
RO | 05.12.2007 | ||
SI | 05.12.2007 | ||
SK | 05.12.2007 | ||
BG | 05.03.2008 | ||
IS | 05.04.2008 | ||
PT | 05.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | CZ | 05.12.2007 | |
EE | 05.12.2007 | ||
IE | 05.12.2007 | ||
LT | 05.12.2007 | ||
LV | 05.12.2007 | ||
PL | 05.12.2007 | ||
RO | 05.12.2007 | ||
SI | 05.12.2007 | ||
SK | 05.12.2007 | ||
IS | 05.04.2008 | ||
PT | 05.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | CZ | 05.12.2007 | |
IE | 05.12.2007 | ||
LT | 05.12.2007 | ||
LV | 05.12.2007 | ||
PL | 05.12.2007 | ||
RO | 05.12.2007 | ||
SI | 05.12.2007 | ||
SK | 05.12.2007 | ||
IS | 05.04.2008 | ||
PT | 05.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/42] | CZ | 05.12.2007 | |
LT | 05.12.2007 | ||
LV | 05.12.2007 | ||
PL | 05.12.2007 | ||
RO | 05.12.2007 | ||
SI | 05.12.2007 | ||
SK | 05.12.2007 | ||
IS | 05.04.2008 | ||
PT | 05.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | CZ | 05.12.2007 | |
LT | 05.12.2007 | ||
LV | 05.12.2007 | ||
PL | 05.12.2007 | ||
RO | 05.12.2007 | ||
SI | 05.12.2007 | ||
SK | 05.12.2007 | ||
IS | 05.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/36] | CZ | 05.12.2007 | |
LT | 05.12.2007 | ||
LV | 05.12.2007 | ||
PL | 05.12.2007 | ||
SI | 05.12.2007 | ||
IS | 05.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/27] | LT | 05.12.2007 | |
LV | 05.12.2007 | ||
PL | 05.12.2007 | ||
SI | 05.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/26] | LT | 05.12.2007 | |
PL | 05.12.2007 | ||
SI | 05.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/25] | LT | 05.12.2007 | |
PL | 05.12.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3813065 (HALLESY H, et al) [X] 1-3,5 * column 16, line 65 - column 17, line 42; figures 43,44 *; | [A]DE3232322 (KRAUSS MAFFEI AG [DE]) [A] 6 * page 12, paragraph L - page 14 *; | [X]DE8803529U (AHP GERHARD MERKLE, 7801 MARCH, DE) [X] 1-3,5 * page 12, paragraph L; figure 4 *; | [A]US4893883 (SATZLER RONALD L [US]) [A] 6* page 5, paragraph L - page 6, paragraph 1 *; | [X]US2004182235 (HART KENNETH E [US]) [X] 1-3,5 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0029] * |