EP1634773 - Roof rack for vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.07.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.08.2007 [2007/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCAMBIA Industrial Developments Aktiengesellschaft In der Ballota 2a 9494 Schaan / LI | [N/P] |
Former [2006/47] | For all designated states SCAMBIA INDUSTRIAL DEVELOPMENTS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT In der Ballota 2a 9494 Schaan / LI | ||
Former [2006/11] | For all designated states ORIS FAHRZEUGTEILE HANS RIEHLE GmbH Im Bornrain 2 71696 Möglingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nägele, Karl Bissinger Strasse 63 74321 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE | 02 /
Riehe, Jörg Lehenstrasse 37 71679 Asperg / DE | [2006/11] | Representative(s) | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Uhlandstrasse 14c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/11] | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte Uhlandstrasse 14 c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 05019519.7 | 08.09.2005 | [2006/11] | Priority number, date | DE20041044834 | 14.09.2004 Original published format: DE102004044834 | [2006/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1634773 | Date: | 15.03.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B60R9/045 | [2006/11] | CPC: |
B60R9/045 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/11] | Title | German: | Dachträger für Kraftfahrzeuge | [2006/11] | English: | Roof rack for vehicles | [2006/11] | French: | Galerie de toit pour véhicule | [2006/11] | Examination procedure | 08.09.2006 | Examination requested [2006/43] | 16.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.02.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/33] | 02.04.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/33] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0606852 (FAPA SPA [IT]) [X] 1,8-26* the whole document *; | [X]DE9407580U (LINNHOFF FRANK [DE]) [X] 1-26 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0647545 (HAPPICH FAHRZEUG DACHSYSTEME [DE]) [X] 1-26 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0681943 (HAPPICH FAHRZEUG DACHSYSTEME [DE]) [X] 1-26 * the whole document *; | [X]DE19734123 (HAPPICH FAHRZEUG DACHSYSTEME [DE]) [X] 1-26 * the whole document * |