EP1602403 - Exhaust emission control device of internal combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.02.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.02.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.03.2011 [2011/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/49] | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hirota, Shinya, Toyota Jidosha K.K. 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | 02 /
Itoh, Kazuhiro, Toyota Jidosha K.K. 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | 03 /
Tanaka, Toshiaki, Toyota Jidosha K.K. 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | 04 /
Iwasaki, Eiji, Toyota Jidosha K.K. 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [2005/49] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/49] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05019691.4 | 23.06.1999 | [2005/49] | Priority number, date | JP19980175637 | 23.06.1998 Original published format: JP 17563798 | [2005/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1602403 | Date: | 07.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1602403 | Date: | 28.12.2005 | [2005/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/94, F01N3/08, F02D21/08, F02M25/07, F01N3/20, F02D41/00 | [2005/52] | CPC: |
B01D53/9409 (EP,US);
F01N3/20 (KR);
B01D53/90 (EP,US);
B01D53/9431 (EP,US);
B01D53/9495 (EP,US);
F01N11/002 (EP,US);
F01N13/009 (EP,US);
F01N13/0093 (EP,US);
F01N13/0097 (EP,US);
F01N13/011 (EP,US);
F01N3/2053 (EP,US);
F01N3/206 (EP,US);
F01N3/2066 (EP,US);
F01N3/208 (EP,US);
F02D35/025 (EP,US);
F02D41/0055 (EP,US);
F02D41/0235 (EP,US);
F02D41/123 (EP,US);
B01D2251/2062 (EP,US);
F01N2250/12 (EP,US);
F01N2510/063 (EP,US);
F01N2510/0682 (EP,US);
F01N2560/06 (EP,US);
F01N2570/14 (EP,US);
F01N2570/18 (EP,US);
F01N2610/02 (EP,US);
F01N2610/146 (EP,US);
F01N2900/08 (EP,US);
F01N2900/1402 (EP,US);
F01N2900/1622 (EP,US);
F02D2200/0602 (EP,US);
F02D2200/0802 (EP,US);
F02D41/1446 (EP,US);
F02M26/13 (EP,US);
F02M26/15 (EP,US);
Y02A50/20 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2005/49] | B01D53/94, F01N3/08, F02D21/08, F02M25/07, F01N3/20 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [2005/49] | Title | German: | Abgaskontrollvorrichtung für Brennkraftmaschinen | [2005/49] | English: | Exhaust emission control device of internal combustion engine | [2005/49] | French: | Dispositif de réglage d'émission de gaz d'échappement dans un moteur à combustion interne | [2005/49] | Examination procedure | 27.02.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/18] | 05.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.10.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/13] | 12.11.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/13] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP99926774.3 / EP1106799 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 11.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH04346819 ; | [Y]DE4214183 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [Y] 12 * column W *; | [X]WO9604980 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-11 * page 2, line 18 - page 4, line 30 * * page 5, line 11 - line 28; figure -; claim - *; | [XY]US5628186 (SCHMELZ HELMUT [DE]) [X] 1-11 * column 2, line 27 - column 4, line 47 * * column 5, line 28 - line 35 * * column 10, line 27 - line 48 * [Y] 12; | [EL]EP0957254 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [EL] 1-7,9-11 * column 2, line 48 - column 3, line 42 * * column 5, line 1 - column 8, line 24 * * column 9, line 49 - column 10, line 46; figure -; claim - *; | [EL]WO0043107 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [EL] 1-4,6,7,9-11 * page 1, line 13 - line 21 * * page 3, line 31 - page 5, line 19; figure .; claim - * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930420), vol. 017, no. 200, Database accession no. (C - 1050), & JP04346819 A 19921202 (NIIGATA ENG CO LTD) [A] 1-11 * abstract * |