EP1640008 - A stabilized aqueous (6S)-folinic acid preparation for injection [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.12.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIPRO CORPORATION 9-3, Honjo-Nishi 3-Chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 531-8510 / JP | [2011/07] |
Former [2006/13] | For all designated states NIPRO CORPORATION 9-3, Honjo-Nishi 3-Chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 531-8510 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Miyaji, Tatsuaki, Nipro Corporation 9-3, Honjo-nishi 3-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 531-8510 / JP | 02 /
Shirouchi, Yutaka, Nipro Corporation 9-3, Honjo-nishi 3-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 531-8510 / JP | 03 /
Sato, Makoto, Nipro Corporation 9-3, Honjo-nishi 3-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 531-8510 / JP | 04 /
Fujisawa, Yuki, Nipro Corporation 9-3, Honjo-nishi 3-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 531-8510 / JP | [2006/13] | Representative(s) | Albrecht, Thomas Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/13] | Albrecht, Thomas Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05019715.1 | 09.09.2005 | [2006/13] | Priority number, date | JP20040268489 | 15.09.2004 Original published format: JP 2004268489 | [2006/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1640008 | Date: | 29.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1640008 | Date: | 16.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/522, A61K9/08 | [2006/13] | CPC: |
A61K31/522 (EP,US);
A61K9/08 (EP,KR,US);
A61K47/02 (EP,US);
A61K47/20 (EP,US);
A61K47/22 (EP,US);
A61K47/24 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/13] | Title | German: | Wässrige, stabile (6S)-Folinsäurelösung zur Injektion | [2006/13] | English: | A stabilized aqueous (6S)-folinic acid preparation for injection | [2006/13] | French: | Préparation aqueuse stable d' acide (6S)-folinique pour injection | [2006/13] | Examination procedure | 10.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/18] | 05.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.12.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 28.12.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.11.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.02.2011 | BE | 16.02.2011 | CY | 16.02.2011 | CZ | 16.02.2011 | DK | 16.02.2011 | EE | 16.02.2011 | FI | 16.02.2011 | HU | 16.02.2011 | IS | 16.02.2011 | IT | 16.02.2011 | LT | 16.02.2011 | LV | 16.02.2011 | NL | 16.02.2011 | PL | 16.02.2011 | RO | 16.02.2011 | SE | 16.02.2011 | SI | 16.02.2011 | SK | 16.02.2011 | TR | 16.02.2011 | BG | 16.05.2011 | GR | 17.05.2011 | ES | 27.05.2011 | PT | 16.06.2011 | IE | 09.09.2011 | LU | 09.09.2011 | CH | 30.09.2011 | LI | 30.09.2011 | MC | 30.09.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 16.02.2011 | |
BE | 16.02.2011 | ||
CY | 16.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.02.2011 | ||
DK | 16.02.2011 | ||
EE | 16.02.2011 | ||
FI | 16.02.2011 | ||
IS | 16.02.2011 | ||
IT | 16.02.2011 | ||
LT | 16.02.2011 | ||
LV | 16.02.2011 | ||
NL | 16.02.2011 | ||
PL | 16.02.2011 | ||
RO | 16.02.2011 | ||
SE | 16.02.2011 | ||
SI | 16.02.2011 | ||
SK | 16.02.2011 | ||
TR | 16.02.2011 | ||
BG | 16.05.2011 | ||
GR | 17.05.2011 | ||
ES | 27.05.2011 | ||
PT | 16.06.2011 | ||
IE | 09.09.2011 | ||
LU | 09.09.2011 | ||
CH | 30.09.2011 | ||
LI | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 16.02.2011 | |
BE | 16.02.2011 | ||
CY | 16.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.02.2011 | ||
DK | 16.02.2011 | ||
EE | 16.02.2011 | ||
FI | 16.02.2011 | ||
IS | 16.02.2011 | ||
IT | 16.02.2011 | ||
LT | 16.02.2011 | ||
LV | 16.02.2011 | ||
NL | 16.02.2011 | ||
PL | 16.02.2011 | ||
RO | 16.02.2011 | ||
SE | 16.02.2011 | ||
SI | 16.02.2011 | ||
SK | 16.02.2011 | ||
BG | 16.05.2011 | ||
GR | 17.05.2011 | ||
ES | 27.05.2011 | ||
PT | 16.06.2011 | ||
IE | 09.09.2011 | ||
LU | 09.09.2011 | ||
CH | 30.09.2011 | ||
LI | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 16.02.2011 | |
BE | 16.02.2011 | ||
CY | 16.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.02.2011 | ||
DK | 16.02.2011 | ||
EE | 16.02.2011 | ||
FI | 16.02.2011 | ||
IT | 16.02.2011 | ||
LT | 16.02.2011 | ||
LV | 16.02.2011 | ||
NL | 16.02.2011 | ||
PL | 16.02.2011 | ||
RO | 16.02.2011 | ||
SE | 16.02.2011 | ||
SI | 16.02.2011 | ||
SK | 16.02.2011 | ||
BG | 16.05.2011 | ||
GR | 17.05.2011 | ||
ES | 27.05.2011 | ||
PT | 16.06.2011 | ||
IE | 09.09.2011 | ||
LU | 09.09.2011 | ||
CH | 30.09.2011 | ||
LI | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/35] | AT | 16.02.2011 | |
BE | 16.02.2011 | ||
CY | 16.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.02.2011 | ||
DK | 16.02.2011 | ||
EE | 16.02.2011 | ||
FI | 16.02.2011 | ||
IT | 16.02.2011 | ||
LT | 16.02.2011 | ||
LV | 16.02.2011 | ||
NL | 16.02.2011 | ||
PL | 16.02.2011 | ||
RO | 16.02.2011 | ||
SE | 16.02.2011 | ||
SI | 16.02.2011 | ||
SK | 16.02.2011 | ||
BG | 16.05.2011 | ||
GR | 17.05.2011 | ||
ES | 27.05.2011 | ||
PT | 16.06.2011 | ||
IE | 09.09.2011 | ||
CH | 30.09.2011 | ||
LI | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/33] | AT | 16.02.2011 | |
BE | 16.02.2011 | ||
CY | 16.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.02.2011 | ||
DK | 16.02.2011 | ||
EE | 16.02.2011 | ||
FI | 16.02.2011 | ||
IT | 16.02.2011 | ||
LT | 16.02.2011 | ||
LV | 16.02.2011 | ||
NL | 16.02.2011 | ||
PL | 16.02.2011 | ||
RO | 16.02.2011 | ||
SE | 16.02.2011 | ||
SI | 16.02.2011 | ||
SK | 16.02.2011 | ||
BG | 16.05.2011 | ||
GR | 17.05.2011 | ||
ES | 27.05.2011 | ||
PT | 16.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.09.2011 | ||
LI | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 16.02.2011 | |
BE | 16.02.2011 | ||
CY | 16.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.02.2011 | ||
DK | 16.02.2011 | ||
EE | 16.02.2011 | ||
FI | 16.02.2011 | ||
IT | 16.02.2011 | ||
LT | 16.02.2011 | ||
LV | 16.02.2011 | ||
NL | 16.02.2011 | ||
PL | 16.02.2011 | ||
RO | 16.02.2011 | ||
SE | 16.02.2011 | ||
SI | 16.02.2011 | ||
SK | 16.02.2011 | ||
BG | 16.05.2011 | ||
GR | 17.05.2011 | ||
ES | 27.05.2011 | ||
PT | 16.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 16.02.2011 | |
BE | 16.02.2011 | ||
CY | 16.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.02.2011 | ||
DK | 16.02.2011 | ||
EE | 16.02.2011 | ||
FI | 16.02.2011 | ||
LT | 16.02.2011 | ||
LV | 16.02.2011 | ||
NL | 16.02.2011 | ||
PL | 16.02.2011 | ||
RO | 16.02.2011 | ||
SE | 16.02.2011 | ||
SI | 16.02.2011 | ||
SK | 16.02.2011 | ||
BG | 16.05.2011 | ||
GR | 17.05.2011 | ||
ES | 27.05.2011 | ||
PT | 16.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | AT | 16.02.2011 | |
BE | 16.02.2011 | ||
CY | 16.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.02.2011 | ||
DK | 16.02.2011 | ||
EE | 16.02.2011 | ||
FI | 16.02.2011 | ||
LT | 16.02.2011 | ||
LV | 16.02.2011 | ||
NL | 16.02.2011 | ||
PL | 16.02.2011 | ||
RO | 16.02.2011 | ||
SE | 16.02.2011 | ||
SI | 16.02.2011 | ||
SK | 16.02.2011 | ||
BG | 16.05.2011 | ||
GR | 17.05.2011 | ||
ES | 27.05.2011 | ||
PT | 16.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 16.02.2011 | |
BE | 16.02.2011 | ||
CY | 16.02.2011 | ||
DK | 16.02.2011 | ||
EE | 16.02.2011 | ||
FI | 16.02.2011 | ||
LT | 16.02.2011 | ||
LV | 16.02.2011 | ||
NL | 16.02.2011 | ||
PL | 16.02.2011 | ||
SE | 16.02.2011 | ||
SI | 16.02.2011 | ||
BG | 16.05.2011 | ||
GR | 17.05.2011 | ||
ES | 27.05.2011 | ||
PT | 16.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/39] | AT | 16.02.2011 | |
BE | 16.02.2011 | ||
CY | 16.02.2011 | ||
FI | 16.02.2011 | ||
LT | 16.02.2011 | ||
LV | 16.02.2011 | ||
NL | 16.02.2011 | ||
PL | 16.02.2011 | ||
SE | 16.02.2011 | ||
SI | 16.02.2011 | ||
BG | 16.05.2011 | ||
GR | 17.05.2011 | ||
ES | 27.05.2011 | ||
PT | 16.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | BE | 16.02.2011 | |
CY | 16.02.2011 | ||
FI | 16.02.2011 | ||
LT | 16.02.2011 | ||
LV | 16.02.2011 | ||
PL | 16.02.2011 | ||
SE | 16.02.2011 | ||
SI | 16.02.2011 | ||
BG | 16.05.2011 | ||
GR | 17.05.2011 | ||
ES | 27.05.2011 | ||
PT | 16.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | LT | 16.02.2011 | |
LV | 16.02.2011 | ||
PL | 16.02.2011 | ||
SE | 16.02.2011 | ||
GR | 17.05.2011 | ||
ES | 27.05.2011 | ||
PT | 16.06.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [DX]EP0416232 (AMERICAN CYANAMID CO [US]) [DX] 1-17 * tables 1,13 *; | [X]EP0482493 (BIORESEARCH SPA [IT]) [X] 1-17 * page 2, line 53; example 5 *; | [PX]WO2005080395 (CERBIOS PHARMA SA [CH], et al) [PX] 1,14* example 3; claims 14-24 * |