EP1638186 - Stator for an electric machine and Method for manufacturing it [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.07.2007 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.08.2007 [2007/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bosch Rexroth AG Heidehofstrasse 31 70184 Stuttgart / DE | [2006/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Groening, Ingolf Häusleäckerweg 11 97816 Lohr am Main / DE | 02 /
Hahn, Ingo Ostlandstrasse 68 97816 Lohr am Main / DE | 03 /
Kunkel, Helmut Hauptstrasse 43 97859 Wiesthal / DE | 04 /
Bach, Joachim Neuweg 13 97753 Karlstadt / DE | [2006/12] | Application number, filing date | 05019743.3 | 10.09.2005 | [2006/12] | Priority number, date | DE20041045659 | 21.09.2004 Original published format: DE102004045659 | [2006/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1638186 | Date: | 22.03.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.01.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H02K1/14, H02K15/02 | [2006/12] | CPC: |
H02K1/146 (EP,US);
H02K15/022 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49009 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/12] | Title | German: | Stator einer elektrischen Maschine und Verfahren für seiner Herstellung | [2006/12] | English: | Stator for an electric machine and Method for manufacturing it | [2006/12] | French: | Stator pour une machine électrique et procédé pour sa fabrication | [2006/12] | Examination procedure | 22.09.2006 | Examination requested [2006/44] | 19.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.03.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/34] | 04.04.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/34] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JP2000069694 ; | [YX]DE2134039 (GEHRIG & CO AG) [Y] 3,4 * page 3, line 11 - page 4, line 12; figure 1 * [X] 10; | [X]EP0871282 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [X] 1,2,5,6,10-12 * column 6, line 43 - column 7, line 29; figure 1 *; | [YX]US6472792 (JACK ALAN G [GB], et al) [Y] 3,4 * column 2, line 48 - column 2, line 65; figure 6 *[X] 10; | [X]US2003020347 (RUPP BERNHARD [DE], et al) [X] 1,10 * paragraph [0043]; figure 4 * | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000922), vol. 2000, no. 06, & JP2000069694 A 20000303 (DENSO CORP) [X] 7-12 * abstract * [Y] 3,4 |