EP1764487 - Working fluid for a OCR-process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.04.2008 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2009 | Change - representative | published on 01.07.2009 [2009/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Solvay Fluor GmbH Hans-Böckler-Allee 20 30173 Hannover / DE | [2007/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Martin Schweigel Kleine Hartwichstrasse 16 50733 Köln / DE | 02 /
Felix Flohr Wildefüerstrasse 14 31134 Hädesheim / DE | 03 /
Christoph Meurer Eckerstrasse 9 30161 Hannover / DE | [2007/12] | Representative(s) | Fischer, Reiner, et al Solvay Fluor GmbH Intellectual Property Department Hans-Boeckler-Allee 20 30173 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/27] | Fischer, Reiner, et al Solvay Fluor GmbH Intellectual Property Department Hans-Boeckler-Allee 20 30173 Hannover / DE | ||
Former [2007/23] | Fischer, Reiner, et al Solvay Fluor GmbH, Hans-Böckler-Allee 20 30173 Hannover / DE | ||
Former [2007/12] | Kulik, Angelika, et al Solvay Fluor GmbH, Hans-Böckler-Allee 20 30173 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 05019969.4 | 19.09.2005 | [2007/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1764487 | Date: | 21.03.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F01K25/08, C09K5/04 | [2007/12] | CPC: |
C09K5/045 (EP,US);
F01K25/08 (EP,KR,US);
C09K5/04 (KR);
F01K25/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2007/48] |
Former [2007/12] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Arbeitsfluid für einen ORC-Prozess | [2007/12] | English: | Working fluid for a OCR-process | [2007/12] | French: | Fluide de travail pour un procédé de type cycle organique de Rankine | [2007/12] | Examination procedure | 22.08.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/19] | 16.11.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2008/19] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2007 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS63308084 ; | [X]US3584457 (DAVOUD JOHN GORDON) [X] 1 * claims 1,3,6 *; | [DX]US4459810 (ENJO NAONORI [JP], et al) [DX] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]US4876855 (YOGEV AMNON [IL], et al) [X] 1,2 * claims 1,3,6,9 *; | [X]US6101813 (SAMI SAMUEL M [CA], et al) [X] 1,2 * column 3, line 42 - line 64 *; | [DA]WO0238718 (SOLVAY [BE], et al) [DA] 1-3,6 * claims 1-12,18 *; | [A]US6423673 (OWENS JOHN G [US], et al) [A] 1,2,5,7 * column 3, lines 1-3; claims 1-3,9 *; | [A]EP1325949 (SOLVAY SOLEXIS SPA [IT]) [A] 1,4* claims 1-8 *; | [X]WO2005078046 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US], et al) [X] 1,5 * the whole document *; | [X]WO2005085398 (HONEYWELL INT INC [US], et al) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1989, no. 05, Database accession no. 1989-035371, XP002366906 & JPS63308084 A 19881215 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD) [X] 1,2 * abstract * |