EP1638215 - Method and apparatus for managing cell-by-cell demodulation timings of a user equipment in an asynchronous mobile telecommunication system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.03.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.04.2009 [2009/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-Dong Yeongtong-Gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-Do / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/12] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-Dong Yeongtong-Gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-Do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Suk, Won-Kyu c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Rim, Jung-Hwan c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
Kim, Joo-Kwang c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2006/12] | Representative(s) | Lang, Johannes, et al Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 20 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/12] | Lang, Johannes, et al Bardehle Pagenberg Dost Altenburg Geissler, Postfach 86 06 20 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05019995.9 | 14.09.2005 | [2006/12] | Priority number, date | KR20040074537 | 17.09.2004 Original published format: KR 2004074537 | [2006/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1638215 | Date: | 22.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1638215 | Date: | 14.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/707, H04B7/02 | [2006/12] | CPC: |
H04B1/7117 (EP,KR,US);
H04B7/0689 (EP,US);
H04B7/0871 (EP,US);
H04W52/40 (EP,US);
H04B1/70735 (EP,US);
H04B1/712 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR, GB, IT, SE [2006/48] |
Former [2006/12] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Verwaltung der Demodulationszeitpunkten auf Zellbasis in einem Anwendergerät eines asynchronen mobilen Telekommunikationssystems | [2006/12] | English: | Method and apparatus for managing cell-by-cell demodulation timings of a user equipment in an asynchronous mobile telecommunication system | [2006/12] | French: | Méthode et procédé pour l'administration, cellule par cellule, des instants de démodulation dans un équipement utilisateur d'un système de télécommunication mobile asynchrone | [2006/12] | Examination procedure | 14.09.2005 | Examination requested [2006/12] | 02.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | 09.11.2007 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 19.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.03.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 28.03.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.02.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6208632 (KOWALSKI JOHN M [US], et al) [X] 1-12 * abstract * * column 11, line 45 - line 63 * * column 12, line 56 - column 13, line 33 *; | [X]US2003207696 (WILLENEGGER SERGE [CH], et al) [X] 1-12 * paragraphs [0254] - [0266] *; | [A] - KHASHJORI N ET AL, "The performance of macrodiversity in the downlink of WCDMA with radio over fibre access network", WIRELESS PERSONAL MULTIMEDIA COMMUNICATIONS, 2002. THE 5TH INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON OCT. 27-30, 2002, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20021027), vol. 2, ISBN 0-7803-7442-8, pages 362 - 366, XP010619110 [A] 1-12 * the whole document * |