Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP1764741
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
22.10.2010 |
Refusal of application |
published on 24.11.2010 [2010/47] |
03.07.2010 |
New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
03.07.2010 |
New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused |
|
19.02.2010 |
Change - representative |
published on 24.03.2010 [2010/12] |
04.12.2009 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
30.10.2009 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
24.09.2009 |
Change: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.09.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.09.2009 |
Change - representative |
published on 07.10.2009 [2009/41] |
02.06.2009 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
01.04.2009 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
01.04.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.11.2008 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
30.10.2008 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
29.02.2008 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
27.11.2007 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
27.11.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.10.2007 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
26.10.2007 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 28.11.2007 [2007/48] |
19.10.2007 |
First examination report |
|
17.10.2007 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
28.09.2007 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] |
16.02.2007 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 21.03.2007 [2007/12] |