EP1645839 - Apparatus and Method for Observing Moving Objects [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.06.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU, LU, TR | published on 04.11.2009 [2009/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SICK AG Erwin-Sick-Strasse 1 79183 Waldkirch / DE | [2007/07] |
Former [2006/15] | For all designated states SICK AG Sebastian-Kneipp-Strasse 1 79183 Waldkirch / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Reichenbach, Juergen Fritz-Böhle-Strasse 32 79312 Emmendingen / DE | 02 /
Schopp, Thomas Schilfweg 11 79112 Freiburg / DE | 03 /
Pierenkemper, Hans-Werner Am Mühlbach 10 79312 Emmendingen / DE | [2006/15] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/15] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05020110.2 | 15.09.2005 | [2006/15] | Priority number, date | DE20041049482 | 11.10.2004 Original published format: DE102004049482 | EP20050010273 | 11.05.2005 Original published format: EP 05010273 | [2006/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1645839 | Date: | 12.04.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1645839 | Date: | 15.08.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G01B11/04, B07C3/14 | [2006/15] | CPC: |
G01B11/04 (EP,US);
B07C3/14 (EP,US);
G01B11/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/15] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Überwachung von bewegten Objekten | [2006/15] | English: | Apparatus and Method for Observing Moving Objects | [2006/15] | French: | Dispositif et procédé pour surveiller des objets en motion | [2006/15] | Examination procedure | 26.07.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/36] | 14.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.07.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 03.07.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.05.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/30] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 15.08.2007 | CZ | 15.08.2007 | EE | 15.08.2007 | LT | 15.08.2007 | LV | 15.08.2007 | RO | 15.08.2007 | SI | 15.08.2007 | SK | 15.08.2007 | TR | 15.08.2007 | LU | 15.09.2007 | MC | 30.09.2007 | BG | 15.11.2007 | GR | 16.11.2007 | IS | 15.12.2007 | HU | 16.02.2008 | [2009/45] |
Former [2009/29] | CZ | 15.08.2007 | |
EE | 15.08.2007 | ||
LT | 15.08.2007 | ||
LV | 15.08.2007 | ||
RO | 15.08.2007 | ||
SI | 15.08.2007 | ||
SK | 15.08.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
BG | 15.11.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
IS | 15.12.2007 | ||
Former [2009/11] | CZ | 15.08.2007 | |
EE | 15.08.2007 | ||
LT | 15.08.2007 | ||
LV | 15.08.2007 | ||
RO | 15.08.2007 | ||
SK | 15.08.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
BG | 15.11.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
IS | 15.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/29] | CZ | 15.08.2007 | |
LT | 15.08.2007 | ||
LV | 15.08.2007 | ||
RO | 15.08.2007 | ||
SK | 15.08.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
BG | 15.11.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
IS | 15.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/25] | CZ | 15.08.2007 | |
LT | 15.08.2007 | ||
LV | 15.08.2007 | ||
SK | 15.08.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
BG | 15.11.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
IS | 15.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | LT | 15.08.2007 | |
LV | 15.08.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
BG | 15.11.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
IS | 15.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/17] | LT | 15.08.2007 | |
LV | 15.08.2007 | ||
BG | 15.11.2007 | ||
IS | 15.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/11] | LT | 15.08.2007 | |
BG | 15.11.2007 | ||
IS | 15.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/07] | LT | 15.08.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]JPH10210354 ; | [A]US5311999 (MALOW SIEGMAR [DE], et al) [A] 18,19 * column 2, line 43 - column 4, line 34 * * figure 1 *; | [Y]US5912698 (GRAULICH MARKUS GUENTER [DE], et al) [Y] 5,7,8 * column 3, line 49 - column 5, line 24 ** figure 1 *; | [YA]EP0984382 (SICK AG [DE]) [Y] 5-8 * page 4, line 3 - page 5, line 31 * * figures 1-3 * [A] 9-12; | [Y]WO0207904 (SOLYSTIC [FR], et al) [Y] 13-17 * page 3, line 26 - page 6, line 34 * * figures 1,2 *; | [YA]EP1431707 (SICK AG [DE]) [Y] 1-3,5-8,13-17,20,21 * paragraph [0027] * * paragraphs [0032] - [0045] * * figures 1-6 * [A] 4,9-12,18,19 | [YA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19981130), vol. 1998, no. 13, & JP10210354 A 19980807 (MINOLTA CO LTD) [Y] 1-3,20,21 * abstract * [A] 4 |